blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2503677

EP2503677 - Reciprocal vibration type power generator equipped with inner columnar and outer annular magnetic motion block [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.08.2015
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yang, Tai-Her
No. 59 Chung Hsing 8 Street
Si-Hu Town
Dzan-Hwa / TW
[2014/42]
Former [2012/39]For all designated states
Yang, Tai-Her
No. 59 Chung Hsing 8 Street Si-Hu Town
Dzan-Hwa / TW
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2012/39]
Representative(s)Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby
Withers & Rogers LLP
2 London Bridge
London SE1 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/39]Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
Application number, filing date12161331.926.03.2012
[2012/39]
Priority number, dateUS20111307161625.03.2011         Original published format: US201113071616
[2012/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2503677
Date:26.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2503677
Date:11.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2503677
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2013
ClassificationIPC:H02K35/02
[2012/39]
CPC:
H02K35/02 (EP,KR,US); H02K5/02 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/39]
TitleGerman:Energieerzeuger vom Reziprokevibrationstyp mit inneren säulenförmigen und ausseren ringförmigen magnetischen Fahrsatz[2012/39]
English:Reciprocal vibration type power generator equipped with inner columnar and outer annular magnetic motion block[2012/39]
French:Générateur d'énergie du type à vibrations réciproques avec moyen magnétique de mouvement cylindrique intérieur et annulaire extérieur[2012/39]
Examination procedure31.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2013Examination requested  [2013/50]
26.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.04.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
09.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2014Fee for grant paid
04.09.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.09.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.03.2014
Opposition(s)16.07.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.03.2012
AL15.10.2014
AT15.10.2014
BE15.10.2014
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MK15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
TR15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU26.03.2012
AT15.10.2014
BE15.10.2014
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MK15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
TR15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
Former [2017/46]HU26.03.2012
AT15.10.2014
BE15.10.2014
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
TR15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
Former [2017/38]HU26.03.2012
AT15.10.2014
BG15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
SM15.10.2014
TR15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
Former [2017/03]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
MT15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
Former [2016/12]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SI15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
Former [2016/07]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
IE26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
Former [2015/47]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
LU26.03.2015
Former [2015/46]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
MC15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/37]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
SK15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/36]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
CZ15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RO15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/35]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
DK15.10.2014
EE15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/26]AT15.10.2014
CY15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/25]AT15.10.2014
ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/24]ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
HR15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
LV15.10.2014
PL15.10.2014
RS15.10.2014
SE15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
GR16.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/23]ES15.10.2014
FI15.10.2014
LT15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
IS15.02.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
PT16.02.2015
Former [2015/21]LT15.10.2014
NO15.01.2015
Former [2015/20]LT15.10.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS58165657  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 4 *;
 [A]JPS614456  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US2004100344  (LIVSHITZ LEONID M [IL], et al) [A] 1* figure 3 *;
 [A]EP1737120  (BEI SENSORS & SYS CO INC [US]) [A] 1 * figure 2a *;
 [A]CN101510717  (JIANGUO YE [CN]) [A] 1 * figure 7 *;
 [A]US7675202  (HUANG BENJAMIN [US]) [A] 1 * figure 4 *;
 [A]CN201656734U  (UNIV ZHEJIANG TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]CN201690339U  (BEIQI FONTON MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * figure 2 *;
 [A]  - KRAUSE W ET AL, "ANTRIEBSSYSTEME FUER AUTOMATEN DER KLEINTEILMONTAGE", TECHNISCHE RUNDSCHAU, HALLWAG AG, CH, (19970404), vol. 89, no. 14, ISSN 1023-0823, pages 26 - 30, XP000659713 [A] 1 * figure 2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.