Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2644802

EP2644802 - Substrate-free surface covering having coupling means [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tarkett GDL
Z.I. Eselborn 2, op der Sang
9779 Lentzweiler / LU
[2013/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Peres, Richard
c/o TARKETT GDL
Z.A. de Salzbaach
9559 Wiltz / LU
02 / Petersson, Lars
c/o TARKETT GDL
Z.A. de Salzbaach
9559 Wiltz / LU
 [2019/35]
Former [2013/40]01 / Peres, Richard
c/o Tarkett GDL
Z.A. de Salzbaach
9559 Wiltz / LU
02 / Petersson, Lars
c/o Tarkett GDL
Z.A. de Salzbaach
9559 Wiltz / LU
Representative(s)Pronovem
Pronovem Luxembourg
12, avenue du Rock n' Roll
BP 327
4004 Esch sur Alzette / LU
[2013/40]
Application number, filing date12161781.528.03.2012
[2013/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2644802
Date:02.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2644802
Date:28.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2012
ClassificationInternational:E04F15/10
[2013/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/35]
Former [2013/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Substratfreie Oberflächenbedeckung mit Kopplungsmitteln[2013/40]
English:Substrate-free surface covering having coupling means[2013/40]
French:Revêtement de surface sans substrat ayant des moyens de couplage[2013/40]
Examination procedure25.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/18]
19.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2019Fee for grant paid
16.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.08.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHR28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
IS28.12.2019
PT30.12.2019
[2020/12]
Former [2020/11]HR28.08.2019
LT28.08.2019
LV28.08.2019
RS28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
GR29.11.2019
PT30.12.2019
Former [2020/10]LT28.08.2019
BG28.11.2019
PT30.12.2019
Former [2020/08]LT28.08.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2180116  (NICOCYL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10 * the whole document * [I] 6,9;
 [X]EP2339092  (FLOORING IND LTD SARL [LU]) [X] 1-5,7,10 * figures 1-14 *;
 [A]EP2153967  (TARKETT FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS2011167744
 DE202010013621U
by applicantUS3205633
 US5630304
 US2004216418
 WO2006043893
 US6715253
 WO0177461
 US2009019808
 US5791114
 US2003131549
 US5448865