Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2613291

EP2613291 - Method and apparatus for displaying medical image [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.07.2014
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.08.2014  [2014/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Medison Co., Ltd.
114, Yangdukwon-ri Nam-myun Hongchun-gun
Kangwon do 250-875 / KR
[2013/28]
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Ho-young
114 Yangdeokwon-ri
Nam-myeon
Hongcheon-gun
250-875 Gangwon-do / KR
 [2013/28]
Representative(s)Schmid, Wolfgang
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Strasse 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/28]Schmid, Wolfgang
Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Strasse 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Application number, filing date12161822.728.03.2012
[2013/28]
Priority number, dateKR2012000114904.01.2012         Original published format: KR 20120001149
[2013/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2613291
Date:10.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06T3/40
[2013/28]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/28]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Anzeigen eines medizinischen Bilds[2013/28]
English:Method and apparatus for displaying medical image[2013/28]
French:Procédé et appareil d'affichage d'image médicale[2013/28]
Examination procedure11.01.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/32]
19.02.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2014/32]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2008118237  (WEGENKITTL RAINER [AT] ET AL) [X] 1-4,7-11,14,15 * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0085] * [I] 5,6,12,13;
 [I]US2002057828  (OOSAWA AKIRA [JP] ET AL) [I] 1,7,8,14,15 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0067] *;
 [A]US2003194057  (DEWAELE PIET [BE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0248] - paragraph [0259] *