Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2560035 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2560035



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 279
20.05.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.07.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
20.06.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
04.06.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
04.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.03.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
31.01.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
31.01.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
31.01.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
31.01.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 49
12.12.2013 Examination started Search / examination 1
08.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.10.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
08.10.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
08.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.04.2013 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
12.03.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.03.2013 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 14
12.03.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 11
12.03.2013 European search report Search / examination 4
23.01.2013 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
21.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.12.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
21.12.2012 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
21.11.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
21.11.2012 Partial European search report Search / examination 4
08.10.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
21.09.2012 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 7
21.08.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
14.08.2012 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 2
09.07.2012 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
09.07.2012 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
09.07.2012 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
03.07.2012 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
26.06.2012 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
31.05.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 68
29.03.2012 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.03.2012 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
29.03.2012 Claims Search / examination 9
29.03.2012 Description Search / examination 36
29.03.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.03.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.03.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.03.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.03.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.03.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.03.2012 Drawings Search / examination 9
29.03.2012 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5