Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2517545

EP2517545 - Seeding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Deletion: Date of oral proceedings 
06.12.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deere & Company
One John Deere Place
Moline, IL 61265 / US
[N/P]
Former [2012/44]For all designated states
DEERE & COMPANY
One John Deere Place
Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rylander, Dave J
1658 Know HYW 7
Victoria, Illinois 61485-9648 / US
02 / Frasier, Michael E
816 Willow St
Iowa City, Iowa 52245 / US
03 / Peterson, James R
206 Tamaroa TRL
Annawan, Illinois 61234 / US
04 / Silbernagel, Carl
1822 55th St Pl
Moline, Illinois 61265 / US
 [2012/44]
Representative(s)Reichert, Christian
John Deere GmbH & Co. KG
Global Intellectual Property Services
John-Deere-Straße 70
68163 Mannheim / DE
[2014/29]
Former [2012/44]Reichert, Christian
Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Straße 70
68163 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date12162080.129.03.2012
[2012/44]
Priority number, dateUS20111309303725.04.2011         Original published format: US201113093037
[2012/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2517545
Date:31.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2517545
Date:16.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.08.2012
ClassificationInternational:A01C7/04
[2014/03]
Former International [2012/44]A01C7/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/44]
TitleGerman:Sämaschine[2012/44]
English:Seeding machine[2012/44]
French:Semoir[2012/44]
Examination procedure11.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/25]
17.02.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.2014Fee for grant paid
04.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.02.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  09.04.2015  14.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG
Am Amazonenwerk 9-13
49205 Hasbergen-Gaste / DE
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 [2015/21]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
26.05.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.10.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.04.2017Date of oral proceedings
18.05.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.05.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition19.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1622/17
28.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.03.2012
AL16.07.2014
AT16.07.2014
BE16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MK16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
SM16.07.2014
TR16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
IE29.03.2015
LU29.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
DE01.10.2015
GB29.03.2016
IT29.03.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU29.03.2012
AT16.07.2014
BE16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MK16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
SM16.07.2014
TR16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
IE29.03.2015
LU29.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
DE01.10.2015
GB29.03.2016
IT29.03.2016
Former [2017/38]HU29.03.2012
AT16.07.2014
BE16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
HR16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
SM16.07.2014
TR16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
IE29.03.2015
LU29.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
DE01.10.2015
GB29.03.2016
IT29.03.2016
Former [2017/13]AT16.07.2014
BE16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
IE29.03.2015
LU29.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
DE01.10.2015
GB29.03.2016
IT29.03.2016
Former [2017/08]AT16.07.2014
BE16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
IE29.03.2015
LU29.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
DE01.10.2015
GB29.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT16.07.2014
BE16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
MT16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
IE29.03.2015
LU29.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
DE01.10.2015
Former [2016/32]AT16.07.2014
BE16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
IE29.03.2015
LU29.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
DE01.10.2015
Former [2016/07]AT16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
IE29.03.2015
LU29.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
DE01.10.2015
Former [2016/06]AT16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
LU29.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2015/50]AT16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SI16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
LU29.03.2015
Former [2015/47]AT16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
LU29.03.2015
Former [2015/46]AT16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
MC16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/23]AT16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
CZ16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
EE16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
SK16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/22]AT16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
DK16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RO16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/12]AT16.07.2014
CY16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
LV16.07.2014
NL16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
RS16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
IS16.11.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY16.07.2014
FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
PL16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
GR17.10.2014
PT17.11.2014
Former [2015/10]FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
BG16.10.2014
NO16.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI16.07.2014
LT16.07.2014
SE16.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT16.07.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1579754  (RABE AGRARSYSTEME GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] *;
 [A]DE102006028573  (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0004] *;
 [A]EP1886548  (TORRICO S R L [IT]) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0008] - [0009] *;
 [A]DE202010000159U  (LEHNER AGRAR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0007] *
by applicantUS4928607
 WO2008135772
 US7395769
 US6715433
 US5170909