Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2506067

EP2506067 - Liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.06.2015
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHENG MEI MATERIALS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
No. 13, Muzhagang W.Rd.
Shanhua Tainan City 741 / TW
[2018/43]
Former [2015/08]For all designated states
CHI MEI MATERIALS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
No. 13, Muzhagang W.Rd.
Shanhua Tainan City 741 / TW
Former [2013/01]For all designated states
Chi Mei Corporation
No. 59-1, San Chia
Jen Te
Tainan City 71702 / TW
Former [2012/40]For all designated states
Chi Mei Corporation
No. 59-1, San Chia
Jen Te
Tianan City 71702 / TW
Inventor(s)01 / Li, Wang-Yang
No. 247-587, Zhuzijiao, Xinhua Dist.
712 Tainan City / TW
02 / Wu, Ting-I
No. 5, Ln. 78, Chengming St., Niaosong Dist.
833 Kaohsiung City / TW
 [2012/40]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/40]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date12162231.029.03.2012
[2012/40]
Priority number, dateTW2011011149731.03.2011         Original published format: TW 100111497
TW2012010836412.03.2012         Original published format: TW 101108364
[2012/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2506067
Date:03.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2012
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/1335
[2012/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung[2012/40]
English:Liquid crystal display device[2012/40]
French:Dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides[2012/40]
Examination procedure02.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.04.2013Examination requested  [2013/20]
27.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2017Date of oral proceedings
15.12.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
15.12.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination14.02.2018Appeal received No.  T1072/18
13.04.2018Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.01.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
29.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[I]WO9622590  (VIRTUAL I O INC [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * page 4, line 3 - line 8 * * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 5; figures 3A,3B * * page 7, line 38 - page 8, line 2; figure 9 *
by applicantJP2003302954
 EP0567995
 US6483612