Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2530950

EP2530950 - Display apparatus and implementation method thereof for installing applications for services [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.09.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Han, Kum-yon
Sinnamusil 6-danji Apt. 665-701
Yeongtong 2-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2012/49]
Representative(s)Appleyard Lees IP LLP
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/07]Bray, Richard Anthony
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
Former [2012/49]Robinson, Ian Michael
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date12162504.030.03.2012
[2012/49]
Priority number, dateKR2011005323102.06.2011         Original published format: KR 20110053231
KR2011008215018.08.2011         Original published format: KR 20110082150
[2012/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2530950
Date:05.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/81, H04N21/458
[2012/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Anzeigevorrichtung und Umsetzungsverfahren dafür zum installieren von Dienstprogramme[2012/49]
English:Display apparatus and implementation method thereof for installing applications for services[2012/49]
French:Appareil d'affichage et son procédé d'implémentation pour l'installation des applications de services[2012/49]
Examination procedure27.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/19]
05.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
19.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
19.05.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination20.07.2015Appeal received No.  T1765/15
30.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.07.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
22.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[I]WO0184320  (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [I] 1-15 * page 1, line 1 - page 12, line 9 *;
 [A]WO0131442  (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6704933  (TANAKA AKIHIRO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * page 1, column 1, line 10 - page 1, column 1, line 60 *