Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2572586

EP2572586 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING A CARCASS PART OF SLAUGHTERED POULTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/13]System and method for processing a carcass part of slaughtered poultry
[2017/48]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.07.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.03.2018New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Marel Stork Poultry Processing B.V.
Handelstraat 3
5831 AV Boxmeer / NL
[2013/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Van den Nieuwelaar, Adrianus Josephes
Den Hoek 33
5421 XG Gemert / NL
02 / Janssen, Petrus Christianus Hendrikus
5, Verbindingsweg
5455 GP Wilbertoord / NL
03 / Van Kippersluis, Johannes Antoon Vincent
Veldhuizerweg 23
6712 DD Ede / NL
 [2014/16]
Former [2013/13]01 / Van den Nieuwelaar, Adrianus Josephes
Den Hoek 33
5421 XG GEMERT / NL
02 / Janssen, Petrus Christianus Hendrikus
5, Verbindingsweg
5455 GP WILBERTOORD / NL
03 / Van Kippersluis, Johannes Antoon Vincent
Veldhuizerweg 23
6712 DD EDE / NL
Representative(s)EP&C
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
[2014/44]
Former [2013/13]Blokhuis, Sophia Elisabeth Dionysia
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date12164268.026.03.2008
[2013/13]
Priority number, dateNL2007103360427.03.2007         Original published format: NL 1033604
[2013/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2572586
Date:27.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2572586
Date:03.04.2013
[2013/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2572586
Date:06.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:A22C21/00
[2013/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2013/13]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von Körperteilen geschlachteten Geflügels[2013/13]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING A CARCASS PART OF SLAUGHTERED POULTRY[2017/48]
French:Système et procédé de traitement d'une pièce de carcasse de volaille abattue[2013/13]
Former [2013/13]System and method for processing a carcass part of slaughtered poultry
Examination procedure23.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.09.2013Examination requested  [2013/45]
17.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.2014Fee for grant paid
17.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08723862.2  / EP2134184
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080723862) is  22.04.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.04.2015  15.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Meyn Food Processing Technology B.V.
Westeinde 6
1511 MA Oostzaan / NL
Opponent's representative
Van Breda, Jacobus
Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V.
Weteringschans 96
1017 XS Amsterdam / NL
 02  06.05.2015  15.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Nordischer Maschinenbau Rud. Baader GmbH + Co. KG
Geniner Strasse 249
23560 Lübeck / DE
Opponent's representative
Stork Bamberger Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Meiendorfer Strasse 89
22145 Hamburg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/24]
Opponent(s)01  23.04.2015   
Meyn Food Processing Technology B.V.
Westeinde 6
1511 MA Oostzaan / NL
Opponent's representative
Van Breda, Jacobus
Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V., Weteringschans 96
1017 XS Amsterdam / NL
 02  06.05.2015   
Nordischer Maschinenbau Rud. Baader GmbH + Co. KG
Geniner Strasse 249
23560 Lübeck / DE
Opponent's representative
Stork Bamberger, et al
Patentanwälte
Postfach 73 04 66
22124 Hamburg / DE
Former [2015/22]
Opponent(s)01  23.04.2015   
Meyn Food Processing Technology B.V.
Westeinde 6
1511 MA Oostzaan / NL
Opponent's representative
Van Breda, Jacobus
Octrooibureau Los & Stigter B.V., Weteringschans 96
1017 XS Amsterdam / NL
22.06.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.12.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
03.11.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition20.12.2017Appeal received No.  T2518/17
01.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
02.01.2018Appeal received No.  T2518/17
21.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
16.11.2017Appeal received No.  T2518/17
18.01.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
16.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
16.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.03.2008
AT06.08.2014
BE06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
MT06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
TR06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
IE26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2017/03]AT06.08.2014
BE06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
MT06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
IE26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/32]AT06.08.2014
BE06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
IE26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/07]AT06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
IE26.03.2015
LU26.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2016/06]AT06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
LU26.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
Former [2015/50]AT06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
LU26.03.2015
Former [2015/47]AT06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
LU26.03.2015
Former [2015/46]AT06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/23]AT06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/22]AT06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/10]FI06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
Former [2015/09]FI06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
Former [2015/08]LT06.08.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]US6283847  (BERRY ALLAN TODD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 9, line 51 - column 11, line 9 *;
 [A]US4648155  (BURNETT T J [US]) [A] 1,2,8,9 * column 1, lines 33-68 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 18; figures 7,8 *;
 [A]US4873746  (SCHEIER DONALD J [US], et al) [A] 1,2,8,9 * column 11, line 53 - column 12, line 44; figures 20-26 *;
 [A]US3266542  (PAOLI STEPHEN A) [A] 12,13 * column 2, line 68 - column 3, line 29; figures 1-16 *;
 [A]EP0421551  (STORK PMT [NL]) [A] 5,14 * column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 30; figures 1,2,4-6 *
by applicantNL1030671C
 NL1014845C
 EP1430780
 WO2008NL00632