Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2478872

EP2478872 - Artificial valve prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.12.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cook Medical Technologies LLC
750 North Daniels Way
Bloomington, IN 47404 / US
[2012/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Fearnot, Neil, E.
1311 East 500 North
West Lafayette, IN Indiana 47906 / US
02 / Leewood, Alan, R.
30 Evergreen Court
Lafayette, IN Indiana 47905 / US
03 / Paul, Ram, H.
1251 West Church Lane
Bloomington, IN Indiana 47403 / US
04 / Roeder, Blayne, A.
411 Kittiwake Court
Lafayette, IN Indiana 47909 / US
05 / Voorhees, Williams, D.
1020 West 850 North
West Lafayette, IN Indiana 47906 / US
 [2012/30]
Representative(s)Garratt, Peter Douglas , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2018/27]
Former [2012/30]Garratt, Peter Douglas , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Application number, filing date12164838.030.05.2007
[2012/30]
Priority number, dateUS20060809201P30.05.2006         Original published format: US 809201 P
[2012/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2478872
Date:25.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2478872
Date:04.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/24
[2012/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/27]
Former [2012/30]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Künstliche Klappenprothese[2012/30]
English:Artificial valve prosthesis[2012/30]
French:Prothèse artificielle de valvule[2012/30]
Examination procedure25.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/10]
14.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.04.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.04.2018Fee for grant paid
23.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.05.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
28.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07795464.2  / EP2020958
Divisional application(s)EP18181176.1  / EP3400908
Opposition(s)05.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
19.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
19.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
19.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
30.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
07.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
08.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
07.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201307   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2013
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
DK04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/24]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
EE04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
SK04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
RO04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
IT04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
ES04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
LV04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT04.07.2018
CZ04.07.2018
FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
PL04.07.2018
SE04.07.2018
BG04.10.2018
GR05.10.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI04.07.2018
LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
IS04.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT04.07.2018
NL04.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL04.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO0149213  (ADVANCED BIO PROSTHETIC SURFAC [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 18, line 8 - page 19, line 10; figures 7-11 * [I] 9-11;
 [XI]WO03047468  (PERCUTANEOUS VALVE TECHNOLOGIE [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 41, lines 10-23; figures 38A,38B * [I] 11;
 [XI]WO0128459  (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 12, line 17 - page 15, line 4; figure 3 * * page 22, lines 17-24; figure 17 * [I] 10,11
ExaminationWO2006004679
by applicantUS6508833
 US2004186558
 US5413599
 US2004225352
 US2004034409
 US4902508
 US5554389
 US5993844
 US6206931
 US6099567
 US2003014126
 WO03002165
 US2004180042
 US4675361
 US6939377
 US4861830
 US6752826
 US2003149471
 US5017664
 US2002187288
 US5589563
 WO03006180
 US2004073297
 US5690642
 US5814061
 US6371961
    - "Shape Memory Alloys", SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, (197911), vol. 281, pages 74 - 82