blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2518520

EP2518520 - Device and method for detecting and locating defects in underground cables [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2022
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.02.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.10.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2021/11]
Former [2012/44]For all designated states
General Electric Company
a New York Company 1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ganesh, Meena
GE Global Research
One Research Circle
Building K1-3A59
Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US
02 / Sundaresan, Ashok
GE Global Research
One Research Circle
Building K1-3A59
Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US
 [2012/44]
Representative(s)Brevalex
Tour Trinity
1 B Place de la Défense
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[N/P]
Former [2021/11]Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
Former [2012/44]Picker, Madeline Margaret
GE International Inc.
Global Patent Operation - Europe
15 John Adam Street
London WC2N 6LU / GB
Application number, filing date12165651.626.04.2012
[2012/44]
Priority number, dateUS20111309821829.04.2011         Original published format: US201113098218
[2012/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2518520
Date:31.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2518520
Date:28.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2518520
Date:17.03.2021
Language:EN
[2021/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2017
ClassificationIPC:G01R31/08, G01R31/12
[2012/44]
CPC:
G01R31/083 (EP,US); G01R31/1272 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/07]
Former [2012/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Erkennung von Defekten in unterirdischen Kabeln[2012/44]
English:Device and method for detecting and locating defects in underground cables[2012/44]
French:Dispositif et procédé de détection et de localisation de défauts dans des câbles souterrains[2012/44]
Examination procedure26.04.2012Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/07]
22.10.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2021Fee for grant paid
08.02.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.02.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.10.2020
Opposition(s)20.12.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2022/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
30.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
30.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
21.04.2020Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.04.2012
AL17.03.2021
AT17.03.2021
CY17.03.2021
CZ17.03.2021
DK17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
ES17.03.2021
FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
IT17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
MC17.03.2021
MK17.03.2021
NL17.03.2021
PL17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SI17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
TR17.03.2021
IE26.04.2021
LU26.04.2021
BE30.04.2021
CH30.04.2021
LI30.04.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
IS17.07.2021
PT19.07.2021
[2024/29]
Former [2024/22]HU26.04.2012
AL17.03.2021
AT17.03.2021
CY17.03.2021
CZ17.03.2021
DK17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
ES17.03.2021
FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
IT17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
MC17.03.2021
MK17.03.2021
NL17.03.2021
PL17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SI17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
IE26.04.2021
LU26.04.2021
BE30.04.2021
CH30.04.2021
LI30.04.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
IS17.07.2021
PT19.07.2021
Former [2023/27]HU26.04.2012
AL17.03.2021
AT17.03.2021
CY17.03.2021
CZ17.03.2021
DK17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
ES17.03.2021
FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
IT17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
MC17.03.2021
NL17.03.2021
PL17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SI17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
IE26.04.2021
LU26.04.2021
BE30.04.2021
CH30.04.2021
LI30.04.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
IS17.07.2021
PT19.07.2021
Former [2023/24]AL17.03.2021
AT17.03.2021
CY17.03.2021
CZ17.03.2021
DK17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
ES17.03.2021
FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
IT17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
MC17.03.2021
NL17.03.2021
PL17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SI17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
IE26.04.2021
LU26.04.2021
BE30.04.2021
CH30.04.2021
LI30.04.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
IS17.07.2021
PT19.07.2021
Former [2022/34]AL17.03.2021
AT17.03.2021
CZ17.03.2021
DK17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
ES17.03.2021
FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
IT17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
MC17.03.2021
NL17.03.2021
PL17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SI17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
IE26.04.2021
LU26.04.2021
BE30.04.2021
CH30.04.2021
LI30.04.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
IS17.07.2021
PT19.07.2021
Former [2022/23]AL17.03.2021
AT17.03.2021
CZ17.03.2021
DK17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
ES17.03.2021
FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
IT17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
MC17.03.2021
NL17.03.2021
PL17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SI17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
IE26.04.2021
LU26.04.2021
CH30.04.2021
LI30.04.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
IS17.07.2021
PT19.07.2021
Former [2022/21]AL17.03.2021
AT17.03.2021
CZ17.03.2021
DK17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
ES17.03.2021
FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
MC17.03.2021
NL17.03.2021
PL17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SI17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
IE26.04.2021
LU26.04.2021
CH30.04.2021
LI30.04.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
PT19.07.2021
Former [2022/11]AL17.03.2021
AT17.03.2021
CZ17.03.2021
DK17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
ES17.03.2021
FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
MC17.03.2021
NL17.03.2021
PL17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SI17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
LU26.04.2021
CH30.04.2021
LI30.04.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
PT19.07.2021
Former [2022/10]AL17.03.2021
AT17.03.2021
CZ17.03.2021
DK17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
ES17.03.2021
FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
MC17.03.2021
NL17.03.2021
PL17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
LU26.04.2021
CH30.04.2021
LI30.04.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
PT19.07.2021
Former [2022/08]AL17.03.2021
AT17.03.2021
CZ17.03.2021
DK17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
ES17.03.2021
FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
MC17.03.2021
NL17.03.2021
PL17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
LU26.04.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
IS17.07.2021
PT19.07.2021
Former [2022/07]AL17.03.2021
AT17.03.2021
CZ17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
ES17.03.2021
FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
MC17.03.2021
NL17.03.2021
PL17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
LU26.04.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
IS17.07.2021
PT19.07.2021
Former [2022/04]AT17.03.2021
CZ17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
ES17.03.2021
FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
NL17.03.2021
PL17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
LU26.04.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
IS17.07.2021
PT19.07.2021
Former [2021/52]AT17.03.2021
CZ17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
ES17.03.2021
FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
NL17.03.2021
PL17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
IS17.07.2021
PT19.07.2021
Former [2021/51]AT17.03.2021
CZ17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
ES17.03.2021
FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
NL17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
IS17.07.2021
PT19.07.2021
Former [2021/50]AT17.03.2021
CZ17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
NL17.03.2021
RO17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SK17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
PT19.07.2021
Former [2021/48]AT17.03.2021
CZ17.03.2021
EE17.03.2021
FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
NL17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
Former [2021/46]AT17.03.2021
FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LT17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
NL17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
SM17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
Former [2021/43]FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
NL17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
Former [2021/37]FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
LV17.03.2021
RS17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
Former [2021/36]FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
BG17.06.2021
NO17.06.2021
GR18.06.2021
Former [2021/35]FI17.03.2021
HR17.03.2021
NO17.06.2021
Former [2021/33]FI17.03.2021
NO17.06.2021
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0184169  (GEORGIA TECH RES INST [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 13, line 22 - column 22, line 22 *;
 [IA]US7427867  (HAYNES LEONARD S [US], et al) [I] 1,9,15 * column 5, line 26 - column 9, line 14; figures 1-3A * [A] 2-8,10-14;
 [A]US2009289637  (RADTKE WILLIAM O [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0062]; figures 1-11 *;
 [A]WO2010109382  (TECHIMP TECHNOLOGIES S A [LU], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 8, line 34 - page 17, line 11; figure 1 *;
 [I]US2010253364  (GANESH MEENA [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0045]; figures 3-6 *;
 [IA]  - XIAOXING ZHANG ET AL, "Kernel statistical uncorrelated optimum discriminant vectors algorithm for GIS PD recognition", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON DIELECTRICS AND ELECTRICAL INSULATION, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20090201), vol. 16, no. 1, ISSN 1070-9878, pages 206 - 213, XP011251577 [I] 1,9,15 * Section 3;; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-8,10-14
 [IA]  - Jaafari Mousavi., "UNDERGROUND DISTRIBUTION CABLE INCIPIENT FAULT DIAGNOSIS SYSTEM", Diss. Texas A&M University., (20070425), pages 1 - 195, URL: http://oaktrust.library.tamu.edu/bitstream/handle/1969.1/4675/etd-tamu-2005C-ELEN-Jaafari.pdf?sequence=1, (20161206), XP055326357 [I] 1,9,15 * Section 4.3.2;; figures 4,15 * [A] 2-8,10-14
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.