Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2650764

EP2650764 - Conductor pattern structure of capacitive touch panel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.12.2015
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TPK Touch Solutions (Xiamen) Inc.
No.199 Ban Shang Road Information&Photoelectricity Park Xiamen Torch Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Xiamen
Fujian 361009 / CN
[2013/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Chang, Ching-Yang
No.35, Kangjhuang St., Jhudong Township
310 Hsinchu County / CN
02 / Chien, Shun-Ta
No.10, Aly. 1, Ln. 43, Kanxia, Dayuan Township
337 Taoyuan County / CN
03 / Zhang, Fanzhong
No.4, Jinhuyi LI
Huli District
1004 Xiamen Fujian / CN
 [2013/42]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/43]Prinz & Partner
Postfach 31 04 20
80104 München / DE
Application number, filing date12166553.303.05.2012
[2013/42]
Priority number, dateUS20121344479311.04.2012         Original published format: US201213444793
[2013/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2650764
Date:16.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2650764
Date:21.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/044
[2013/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Leitermusterstruktur eines kapazitiven Berührungsbildschirms[2013/42]
English:Conductor pattern structure of capacitive touch panel[2013/42]
French:Structure de motif conducteur de panneau tactile capacitif[2013/42]
Examination procedure19.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
19.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
09.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
09.11.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination04.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0851/17
17.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.06.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2008264699  (CHANG CHING-YANG [TW], et al) [Y] 1-7,10-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [00 9] , [0 12] , [0 30] - [0036] *;
 [Y]US2002186330  (KAWASAKI KIYOHIRO [JP]) [Y] 1-5,10-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0125] - [0129] - [ 135] *;
 [Y]CN202084024U  (TPK PHOTOELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 6,7,10 * the whole document *;
 US2012113042  [ ] (BAYRAMOGLU GOKALP [CN], et al) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0080] , [0 81] *
by applicantUS6970160
 US4233522
 US4733222
 US5880411
 US6414671
 US5374787
 US7030860
 US5459463
 US6498590
 US5847690