Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2662782

EP2662782 - Method and system for storing data in a database [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.10.2014
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.11.2014  [2014/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
[2013/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Boero, Andrea
via Romana di Quarto 79/7
16147 Genova / IT
02 / Selvaggio, Ignazio
Via Donghi 49/3
16132 Genova / IT
 [2013/46]
Representative(s)Fischer, Michael
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[2013/46]
Application number, filing date12167434.510.05.2012
[2013/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2662782
Date:13.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2013/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zum Speichern von Daten in einer Datenbank[2013/46]
English:Method and system for storing data in a database[2013/46]
French:Procédé et système pour stocker des données dans une base de données[2013/46]
Examination procedure14.05.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/48]
23.06.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2014/48]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - BPANULLA, "How to design a database for storing a sorted list?", (20110913), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20120105153237/http://dba.stackexchange.com/questions/5683/how-to-design-a-database-for-storing-a-sorted-list, (20130524), XP002697703 [Y] 1-10 * page 1 * * pages 4-5 *
 [Y]  - Oli Tyler, "Represent Ordering in a Relational Database", (20080924), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20081023170116/http://stackoverflow.com/questions/21388/represent-ordering-in-a-relational-database, (20130523), XP002697704 [Y] 1-10 * page 2 *
 [A]  - "Linked list", (20120422), Internet, Wikipedia, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Linked_list&oldid=488624981, (20130524), XP002697701 [A] 1-10 * page 4 *
 [A]  - AHO A V; HOPCROFT J E; ULLMAN J DAHO A V; HOPCROFT J E; ULLMAN J, ALGORTMY I STRUKTURY DANYCH (DATA STRUCTURES AND ALGORITHMS), GLIWICE, POLEN, Wydawnictwo HELION, (2003), pages 55 - 62, ISBN 83-7361-177-0, XP002697702 [A] 1-10 * pages 55, 60 *