Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2523171

EP2523171 - System for playing multiplayer games [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2014
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Waterleaf Ltd.
Top Floor 14 Athol Street Douglas
Isle of Man IM1 1JA / GB
[2012/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Moshal, Martin Paul
Apartment 19
Cormorant Wharf
Queens Way Quay
Gibraltar / GI
 [2012/46]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/46]Butler, Michael John
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date12167537.510.05.2012
[2012/46]
Priority number, dateGB2011000811813.05.2011         Original published format: GB 201108118
[2012/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2523171
Date:14.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2523171
Date:12.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:G07F17/32
[2012/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:System zum Spielen von Mehrfachspieler-Spielen[2012/46]
English:System for playing multiplayer games[2012/46]
French:Récipient souple et flexible autoventilé[2012/46]
Examination procedure12.12.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/04]
05.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.10.2015
06.10.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
14.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination23.12.2015Appeal received No.  T0741/16
23.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.03.2014
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
17.11.2014Request for further processing filed
17.11.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.11.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2005033825  (WATERLEAF LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 10 - page 22; figures 1-3; claims 1-55 *;
 [ID]WO03093921  (WATERLEAF LTD [GB], et al) [ID] 1-15 * page 5 - page 22; figures 1-3; claims 1-47 *;
 [I]EP2284812  (WATERLEAF LTD [GB]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0074]; figures 1-2 *;
 [I]EP1739639  (WATERLEAF LTD [GB]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0070]; figure 3 *;
 [I]EP1903522  (WATERLEAF LTD [GB]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0068]; figure 7 *;
 [I]WO2004050201  (WATERLEAF LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 9 - page 23; figures 1-2 *;
 [A]EP1912185  (WATERLEAF LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * figure 3 *;
 [A]EP1895484  (WATERLEAF LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * figures 2-3 *
by applicantWO03093921