Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2527782

EP2527782 - Cross-sectional profile measuring method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitutoyo Corporation
20-1, Sakado 1-chome
Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP
[2014/39]
Former [2012/48]For all designated states
Mitutoyo Corporation
20-1, Sakado 1-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Michiwaki, Hirokazu
c/o Mitutoyo Corporation
20-1 Sakado 1-chome
Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP
 [2012/48]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/48]Skone James, Robert Edmund
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date12169307.124.05.2012
[2012/48]
Priority number, dateJP2011011944527.05.2011         Original published format: JP 2011119445
[2012/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2527782
Date:28.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2527782
Date:25.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2527782
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01B5/008, G01B5/20, G01B21/04
[2012/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/48]
TitleGerman:Querschnittprofil-Messverfahren[2012/48]
English:Cross-sectional profile measuring method[2012/48]
French:Procédé de mesure de profil de section transversale[2012/48]
Examination procedure13.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/17]
20.06.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2014Fee for grant paid
13.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.06.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.06.2015   
Carl Zeiss Industrielle Messtechnik GmbH
Carl Zeiss Strasse 22
73447 Oberkochen / DE
Opponent's representative
Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
 [2015/31]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
23.07.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.11.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.12.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition15.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0534/17
12.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.05.2012
AL24.09.2014
AT24.09.2014
BE24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
MK24.09.2014
MT24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
SM24.09.2014
TR24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
IE24.05.2015
LU24.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
FR01.06.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU24.05.2012
AT24.09.2014
BE24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
MK24.09.2014
MT24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
SM24.09.2014
TR24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
IE24.05.2015
LU24.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
FR01.06.2015
Former [2017/46]HU24.05.2012
AT24.09.2014
BE24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
MT24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
SM24.09.2014
TR24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
IE24.05.2015
LU24.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
FR01.06.2015
Former [2017/38]HU24.05.2012
AT24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
MT24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
SM24.09.2014
TR24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
IE24.05.2015
LU24.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
FR01.06.2015
Former [2017/03]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
MT24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
IE24.05.2015
LU24.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
FR01.06.2015
Former [2016/25]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
IE24.05.2015
LU24.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
FR01.06.2015
Former [2016/20]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
IE24.05.2015
LU24.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
Former [2016/12]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
LU24.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
Former [2016/06]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
LU24.05.2015
CH31.05.2015
LI31.05.2015
Former [2015/37]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/35]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/25]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/24]CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/23]CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/22]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/16]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
HR24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
RS24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
GR25.12.2014
Former [2015/10]FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
NO24.12.2014
Former [2015/09]FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT24.09.2014
Documents cited:Search[IY]US2010050837  (OULD JOHN CHARLES [GB], et al) [I] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0094] * * claims 1,5,8 * * figures 6, 10 * [Y] 1-3;
 [Y]US2005132591  (KOJIMA TSUKASA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0166] * * figures 1,10 *;
 [Y]US2009299692  (YOSHIZUMI KEIICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0102] * * figures 3,4a *;
 [Y]US2008189969  (FUCHS ANDREAS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0053] * * figures 2-6 *
by applicantJP2009531695
 JP2009293992
 JP2009501321