Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2540879

EP2540879 - Deviation device of webs to a lap winder on a spinning line [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.01.2014
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
13.08.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Marzoli S.p.A.
Via S. Alberto, 10
25036 Palazzolo Sull'Oglio, Brescia / IT
[2013/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Prandini, Girolamo
c/o MARZOLI S.p.A.
Via S. Alberto, 10
25036 Palazzolo Sull'Oglio, Brescia / IT
02 / Gregori, Antonio
c/o MARZOLI S.p.A.
Via S. Alberto, 10
I-25036 Palazzolo Sull'Oglio, Brescia / IT
 [2013/01]
Representative(s)Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Piazza della Vittoria, 11
25122 Brescia / IT
[N/P]
Former [2013/01]Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11
I-25122 Brescia / IT
Application number, filing date12169364.224.05.2012
[2013/01]
Priority number, dateIT2011BS0009729.06.2011         Original published format: IT BS20110097
[2013/01]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2540879
Date:02.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2540879
Date:12.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:D01G21/00, D01G27/00
[2013/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/01]
TitleGerman:Umleitungsvorrichtung von Bahnen auf einen Schleifenwickler auf einer Spinnanlage[2013/01]
English:Deviation device of webs to a lap winder on a spinning line[2013/01]
French:Dispositif de déviation de bandes pour enrouleur de nappe sur une ligne de filage[2013/01]
Examination procedure25.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/31]
18.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2013Fee for grant paid
17.12.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.09.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.08.2014   
Trützschler GmbH & Co. KG
Duvenstrasse 82-92
41199 Mönchengladbach / DE
 [2014/39]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
17.12.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.06.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.04.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition14.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1432/16
22.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
23.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.05.2012
AL12.02.2014
AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
BG12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
IT12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
MC12.02.2014
MK12.02.2014
MT12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SI12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
SM12.02.2014
TR12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
GR13.05.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
GB24.05.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU24.05.2012
AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
BG12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
IT12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
MC12.02.2014
MK12.02.2014
MT12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SI12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
SM12.02.2014
TR12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
GR13.05.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
GB24.05.2016
Former [2017/36]HU24.05.2012
AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
BG12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
IT12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
MC12.02.2014
MT12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SI12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
SM12.02.2014
TR12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
GR13.05.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
GB24.05.2016
Former [2016/33]HU24.05.2012
AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
BG12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
IT12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
MC12.02.2014
MT12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SI12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
SM12.02.2014
TR12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
GR13.05.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2016/32]HU24.05.2012
AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
BG12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
IT12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
MC12.02.2014
MT12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SI12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
SM12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
GR13.05.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2016/31]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
BG12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
IT12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
MC12.02.2014
MT12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SI12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
SM12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
GR13.05.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2016/28]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
IT12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
MC12.02.2014
MT12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SI12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
SM12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
GR13.05.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2016/22]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
IT12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
MC12.02.2014
MT12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SI12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
SM12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2016/16]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
IT12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
MC12.02.2014
MT12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SI12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2015/24]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
IT12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
MC12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SI12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
FR02.06.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2015/21]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
IT12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
MC12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
IE24.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2015/18]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
IT12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
MC12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2015/09]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
MC12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2015/04]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
LU24.05.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2014/50]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
PL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
SK12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2014/49]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
RO12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2014/48]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
CZ12.02.2014
DK12.02.2014
EE12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2014/42]AT12.02.2014
BE12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2014/41]AT12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
HR12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
LV12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
RS12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2014/39]AT12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
NL12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2014/37]AT12.02.2014
CY12.02.2014
ES12.02.2014
FI12.02.2014
LT12.02.2014
SE12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
IS12.06.2014
PT12.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT12.02.2014
NO12.05.2014
IS12.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[YDA]EP0679741  (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [YD] 1-11 * figures 4,12 * [A] 12-17;
 [Y]GB523579  (COURTAULDS LTD, et al) [Y] 1-11 * figure 1 *
by applicantEP0679740
 EP0679741
 WO2010070608