Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2527351

EP2527351 - Lipophosphonoxins, method of their preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2014
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ustav organicke chemie a biochemie AV CR, v.v.i.
Flemingovo nam. 542/2
166 10 Praha 6 / CZ
For all designated states
Mikrobiologicky ustav AV CR, v.v.i.
Videnska 1083
142 20 Praha 4 - Krc / CZ
For all designated states
Ustav molekularni genetiky AV CR, v.v.i.
Videnska 1083
142 20 Praha 4 / CZ
For all designated states
Trios, spol. s r.o.
Zakourilova 142
14900 Praha 4 / CZ
[2013/50]
Former [2012/48]For all designated states
Ustav Organicke Chemie A Biochemie Av Cr, V.v.i.
Flemingovo nam. 542/2
166 10 Praha 6 / CZ
For all designated states
Mikrobiologicky Ustav AV CR V.V.I.
Videnska 1083
142 20 Praha 4 - Krc / CZ
For all designated states
Ustav Molekularni Genetiky Av Cr, V.v.i.
Videnska 1083
142 20 Praha 4 / CZ
For all designated states
Trios, spol. s r.o.
Zakourilova 142
14900 Praha 4 / CZ
Inventor(s)01 / Rejman, Dominik
U Vody 9/1399
17000 Praha 7 / CZ
02 / Pohl, Radek
K Visnovce 155
25264 Uholicky / CZ
03 / Bartunek, Petr
Dusni 1
11000 Praha 1 / CZ
04 / Ribeiro Pombinho, Antonio Jose
Travessa da Figueira 1
Golfeiras, Mirandela / PT
05 / Krasny, Libor
Smetanova 1487
25263 Roztoky u Prahy / CZ
06 / Latal, Tomas
Loucky 137
78314 Hlusovice / CZ
 [2012/48]
Representative(s)Gabrielova, Marta , et al
Inventia s.r.o. Na Belidle 3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
[2012/48]
Application number, filing date12169491.325.05.2012
[2012/48]
Priority number, dateCZ2011000031226.05.2011         Original published format: CZ 20110312
[2012/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2527351
Date:28.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2527351
Date:11.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:C07F9/6558, C07F9/6561, A61K31/675, A61P31/04
[2012/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/48]
TitleGerman:Lipophosphonoxine, Verfahren zur Herstellung und Verwendung[2012/48]
English:Lipophosphonoxins, method of their preparation and use[2012/48]
French:Lipophosphonoxines, leur procédé de préparation et d'utilisation[2012/48]
Examination procedure31.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.11.2012Examination requested  [2013/01]
24.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.08.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.10.2013Fee for grant paid
23.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.07.2013
Opposition(s)12.09.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/47]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.05.2012
AL11.12.2013
AT11.12.2013
BE11.12.2013
BG11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
IT11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MK11.12.2013
MT11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
PL11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
TR11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
GR12.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU25.05.2012
AT11.12.2013
BE11.12.2013
BG11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
IT11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MK11.12.2013
MT11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
PL11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
TR11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
GR12.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2016/33]HU25.05.2012
AT11.12.2013
BE11.12.2013
BG11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
IT11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MT11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
PL11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
TR11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
GR12.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2016/32]HU25.05.2012
AT11.12.2013
BE11.12.2013
BG11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
IT11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MT11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
PL11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
GR12.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2016/31]AT11.12.2013
BE11.12.2013
BG11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
IT11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MT11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
PL11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
GR12.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2016/29]AT11.12.2013
BE11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
IT11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MT11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
PL11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
GR12.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2016/28]AT11.12.2013
BE11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MT11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
PL11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
GR12.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2016/22]AT11.12.2013
BE11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MT11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
PL11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
SM11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2016/16]AT11.12.2013
BE11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
MT11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
PL11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2015/14]AT11.12.2013
BE11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
PL11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SI11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2014/48]AT11.12.2013
BE11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
DK11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
PL11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2014/37]AT11.12.2013
BE11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
CZ11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
ES11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
PL11.12.2013
RO11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
SK11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
PT11.04.2014
Former [2014/36]AT11.12.2013
BE11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
EE11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
IS11.04.2014
Former [2014/34]AT11.12.2013
BE11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
Former [2014/26]AT11.12.2013
CY11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
Former [2014/25]AT11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
LV11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
Former [2014/24]AT11.12.2013
FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
RS11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI11.12.2013
HR11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI11.12.2013
LT11.12.2013
NL11.12.2013
SE11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
Former [2014/20]LT11.12.2013
NO11.03.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]  - SUK ET AL, "Phosphonoxins: Rational design and discovery of a potent nucleotide anti-Giardia agent", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, (20070427), vol. 17, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2007.02.063, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2811 - 2816, XP022049593 [A] 1,2,8-11 * compounds 10f, g * * tables 1,2 * * Scheme 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2007.02.063
 [XP]  - DOMINIK REJMAN ET AL, "Lipophosphonoxins: New Modular Molecular Structures with Significant Antibacterial Properties", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20111124), vol. 54, no. 22, doi:10.1021/jm2009343, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 7884 - 7898, XP055036669 [XP] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm2009343
by applicant   - DAVIES D.; DAVIES J., MICROBIOL. MOL. BIOL. REV., (2010), vol. 74, no. 3, page 417
    - KESSELHEIM A. S.; OUTTERSON K., HEALTH AFF., (2010), vol. 29, page 1689
    - SUK D. H.; REJMAN D. ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETTERS, (2007), vol. 17, no. 10, page 2811
    - ISONO, K.; ASAHI K.; SUZUKI S., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1969), vol. 91, page 7490
    - ISONO K. ET AL., AGRICULTURAL BIOL. CHEM., (1965), vol. 29, page 848
    - ENDO A.; KAKIKI K.; MISATO J., J. BACTERIOD., (1970), vol. 104, page 189
    - OHTA N.; KAKIKI K.; MISATO, T., AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM., (1970), vol. 34, page 1224
    - BUGG T. D. H.; LLOYD A. J.; ROPER D. I., INFECT. DIS. DRUG TARGETS, (2006), vol. 6, page 85
    - KIMURA K.; BUGG T. D. H., NAT. PROD. REP., (2003), vol. 20, page 252
    - BOUHSS A. ET AL., J. MOL. MICROBIOL., (1999), vol. 34, page 576
    - BOUHSS A. ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL. REV., (2008), vol. 32, page 208
    - BOUHSS, A. ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL. REV., (2008), vol. 32, page 208
    - TANINO T. ET AL., MED. CHEM. LETT., (2010), vol. 1, page 258
    - IGARASHI M. ET AL., J. ANTIBIOT., (2003), vol. 56, page 580
    - IGARASHI M. ET AL., J. ANTIBIOT., (2005), vol. 58, page 327
    - KIMURA K ET AL., AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 53, page 1811
    - GAO, FENG ET AL., CHEMISTRY-A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (2009), vol. 15, no. 9, pages 2064 - 2070