Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2517674

EP2517674 - Implantable vascular device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.08.2018  [2018/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cook Medical Technologies LLC
750 North Daniels Way
Bloomington, IN 47404 / US
For all designated states
Oregon Health & Science University
3181 Southwest Sam Jackson Park Road
Portland
Oregon 97201-3098 / US
[2016/11]
Former [2012/44]For all designated states
Cook Medical Technologies LLC
750 North Daniels Way
Bloomington, IN 47404 / US
For all designated states
Oregon Health and Science University
3181 Southwest Sam Jackson Park Road Portland
Oregon 97201-3098 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Pavnik, Dusan
7676 S.W. Skyhar Drive
Portland, OR 97223 / US
02 / Sisken, Richard B.
2150 Robinhood Lane
West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US
03 / Case, Brian L.
424 Cyprus Circle
Lake Villa IL 60046 / US
04 / Flagle, Jacob A.
2320 S. Pennsylvania Street
Indianapolis, IN 46225 / US
05 / Garrison, Mike
9047 Holliday Drive
Indianapolis, IN 46260 / US
06 / Hoffa, Andrew K.
550 West Fairway Lane
Bloomington, IN 47401 / US
07 / Leonard, Raymond B., II
3503 Willam Court
Bloomington, IN 47401 / US
08 / Osborne, Thomas A.
9480 S. Pointe LaSalles Drive
Bloomington, IN 47401 / US
09 / Paul, Ram H., Jr
1251 West Church Lane
Bloomington, IN 47401 / US
10 / Schaeffer, Darin G.
3011 S. Market Place
Bloomington, IN 47403 / US
 [2012/44]
Representative(s)Garratt, Peter Douglas , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2016/11]
Former [2012/44]Garratt, Peter Douglas , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Application number, filing date12169646.215.08.2003
[2012/44]
Priority number, dateUS20020403783P15.08.2002         Original published format: US 403783 P
[2012/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2517674
Date:31.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2517674
Date:16.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/24, A61F2/06
[2012/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/11]
Former [2012/44]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Implantierbare vaskuläre Vorrichtung[2012/44]
English:Implantable vascular device[2012/44]
French:Dispositif vasculaire implantable[2012/44]
Examination procedure20.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/18]
15.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.10.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
17.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.2015Fee for grant paid
08.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.01.2016Information about intention to grant a patent
12.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03788601.7  / EP1545392
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030788601) is  25.01.2011
Opposition(s)19.12.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
25.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
10.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 10
07.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 11
07.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 12
07.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.08.2003
AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
TR16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
PT18.07.2016
LU15.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
FR31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
[2018/29]
Former [2018/28]HU15.08.2003
AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CY16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
PT18.07.2016
LU15.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
FR31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
PT18.07.2016
LU15.08.2016
CH31.08.2016
FR31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2017/23]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SI16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
PT18.07.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2017/19]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
MC16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
BG16.06.2016
GR17.06.2016
PT18.07.2016
CH31.08.2016
LI31.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
DK16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
GR17.06.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT16.03.2016
BE16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
IT16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
GR17.06.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2016/51]AT16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
GR17.06.2016
PT18.07.2016
Former [2016/50]AT16.03.2016
CZ16.03.2016
EE16.03.2016
ES16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
RO16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
SK16.03.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/49]EE16.03.2016
FI16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/40]FI16.03.2016
NL16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/39]FI16.03.2016
SE16.03.2016
GR17.06.2016
Former [2016/35]FI16.03.2016
GR17.06.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]WO0156500  (COOK INC) [X] 1 * the whole document *
ExaminationWO0243620