blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2528235

EP2528235 - Test and measurement instrument including asynchronous time-interleaved digitizer using harmonic mixing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.02.2022
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.03.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.10.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tektronix, Inc.
14150 SW Karl Braun Drive P.O. Box 500, M/S 50-LAW
Beaverton, Oregon 97077-0001 / US
[2014/39]
Former [2012/48]For all designated states
TEKTRONIX, INC.
14150 S.W. Karl Braun Drive P.O. Box 500, M/S 50-LAW
Beaverton, OR 97077-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Knierim, Daniel G.
14170 SW Barlow Road
Beaverton, OR Oregon 97008 / US
 [2012/48]
Representative(s)HGF
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2021/14]HGF
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
Former [2014/03]Clarke, Jeffrey, et al
Harrison Goddard Foote LLP
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield, Yorkshire S1 2JA / GB
Former [2012/48]Brinck, David John Borchardt, et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date12169732.029.05.2012
[2012/48]
Priority number, dateUS20111311623426.05.2011         Original published format: US201113116234
[2012/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2528235
Date:28.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2528235
Date:03.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2528235
Date:07.04.2021
Language:EN
[2021/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2013
ClassificationIPC:H03M1/12, // G01R13/02
[2013/27]
CPC:
H03M1/121 (EP,US); G01R13/0272 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2012/48]H03M1/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/14]
Former [2012/48]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Test- und Messinstrument mit asynchronem zeitverschachteltem Digitalisierer unter Verwendung von Oberwellenmischung[2012/48]
English:Test and measurement instrument including asynchronous time-interleaved digitizer using harmonic mixing[2012/48]
French:Instrument de mesure et de test comprenant un numériseur à entrelacement temporel asynchrone utilisant le mélange harmonique[2012/48]
Examination procedure03.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/09]
24.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
19.10.2020Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.10.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2021Fee for grant paid
26.02.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.02.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.08.2018
Opposition(s)10.01.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
27.05.2020Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.05.2012
AL07.04.2021
AT07.04.2021
CY07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
IT07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
MK07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SI07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
TR07.04.2021
IE29.05.2021
LU29.05.2021
BE31.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
FR07.06.2021
BG07.07.2021
GB07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
[2024/29]
Former [2024/22]HU29.05.2012
AL07.04.2021
AT07.04.2021
CY07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
IT07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
MK07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SI07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
IE29.05.2021
LU29.05.2021
BE31.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
FR07.06.2021
BG07.07.2021
GB07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2023/29]HU29.05.2012
AL07.04.2021
AT07.04.2021
CY07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
IT07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SI07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
IE29.05.2021
LU29.05.2021
BE31.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
FR07.06.2021
BG07.07.2021
GB07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2023/24]AL07.04.2021
AT07.04.2021
CY07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
IT07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SI07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
IE29.05.2021
LU29.05.2021
BE31.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
FR07.06.2021
BG07.07.2021
GB07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2022/36]AL07.04.2021
AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
IT07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SI07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
IE29.05.2021
LU29.05.2021
BE31.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
FR07.06.2021
BG07.07.2021
GB07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2022/34]AL07.04.2021
AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SI07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
IE29.05.2021
LU29.05.2021
BE31.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
FR07.06.2021
BG07.07.2021
GB07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2022/29]AL07.04.2021
AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SI07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
IE29.05.2021
LU29.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
FR07.06.2021
BG07.07.2021
GB07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2022/26]AL07.04.2021
AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
IE29.05.2021
LU29.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
FR07.06.2021
BG07.07.2021
GB07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2022/23]AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
IE29.05.2021
LU29.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
FR07.06.2021
BG07.07.2021
GB07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2022/22]AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
IE29.05.2021
LU29.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
BG07.07.2021
GB07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
PT09.08.2021
IS22.12.2021
Former [2022/21]AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
IE29.05.2021
LU29.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
PT09.08.2021
IS22.12.2021
Former [2022/10]AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
LU29.05.2021
CH31.05.2021
LI31.05.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
PT09.08.2021
IS22.12.2021
Former [2022/09]AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
LU29.05.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2022/08]AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
LU29.05.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2022/07]AT07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2021/52]AT07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2021/51]AT07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2021/50]AT07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2021/49]AT07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
Former [2021/47]AT07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
Former [2021/46]AT07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2004038432  (LECROY CORP [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *;
 [I]US2008231488  (PICKERD JOHN J [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0022] - [0023] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraphs [0032] - [0033] * * paragraphs [0040] - [0041] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0073] * * paragraphs [0075] - [0081] * * paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0109] * * paragraphs [0115] - [0119] * * paragraph [0121] * * paragraphs [0124] - [0125] * * claim 1 * * figures 1,3-13 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.