Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2515620

EP2515620 - Integrated X-ray source module [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Newton Scientific, Inc.
245 Bent Street
Cambridge, MA 1241 / US
[2018/16]
Former [2017/12]For all designated states
Newton Scientific, Inc.
245 Bent Street
Cambridge, MA 02141 / US
Former [2013/01]For all designated states
X-Ray Optical Systems, Inc.
15 Tech Valley Drive
East Greenbush, NY 12061 / US
For all designated states
Newton Scientific, Inc.
245 Bent Street
Cambridge, MA 02141 / US
Former [2012/43]For all designated states
Inpho Inc.
14 Woodmere Drive
Sudbury, MA 01776 / US
For all designated states
Newton Scientific, Inc.
245 Bent Street
Cambridge, MA 02141 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Feda, Francis M.
14 Woodmere Drive
Sudbury, MA 01776 / US
02 / Oettinger, Peter E.
4 Phlox Lane
Acton, MA 01720 / US
03 / Shefer, Ruth E.
218 Beethoven Avenue
Newton, MA 02468 / US
04 / Klinkowstein, Robert E.
7 Red Coach Lane
Winchester, MA 01890 / US
 [2012/43]
Representative(s)Friese Goeden Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Widenmayerstraße 49
80538 München / DE
[2018/38]
Former [2014/24]Andrae Westendorp
Uhlandstrasse 2
80336 München / DE
Former [2013/01]Friese, Martin , et al
Andrae Flach Haug
Balanstrasse 55
81541 München / DE
Former [2012/43]BOVARD AG
Optingenstrasse 16
3000 Bern 25 / CH
Application number, filing date12169820.320.02.2004
[2012/43]
Priority number, dateUS2003037078320.02.2003         Original published format: US 370783
US2004076305122.01.2004         Original published format: US 763051
[2012/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2515620
Date:24.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2515620
Date:19.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2515620
Date:19.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:H05G1/06
[2012/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/38]
Former [2012/43]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Integriertes Röntgenquellenmodul[2012/43]
English:Integrated X-ray source module[2012/43]
French:Module de source de rayons X intégré[2012/43]
Examination procedure19.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/44]
29.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2018Fee for grant paid
12.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04713387.1  / EP1600044
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040713387) is  17.05.2010
Opposition(s)20.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
29.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
29.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
29.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 13
07.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
28.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 15
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SI19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
PT19.01.2019
IE20.02.2019
LU20.02.2019
BE28.02.2019
CH28.02.2019
LI28.02.2019
[2020/12]
Former [2020/09]AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SI19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
PT19.01.2019
IE20.02.2019
LU20.02.2019
CH28.02.2019
LI28.02.2019
Former [2020/04]AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SI19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
PT19.01.2019
LU20.02.2019
CH28.02.2019
LI28.02.2019
Former [2019/50]AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SI19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
PT19.01.2019
LU20.02.2019
Former [2019/47]AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
PT19.01.2019
LU20.02.2019
Former [2019/45]AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/22]CZ19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/21]FI19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/20]FI19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI19.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]US3465154  (BERENDS WERNER) [Y] 8,9,12-14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US4157476  (O'CONNOR RICHARD A [US]) [Y] 8,9,12-14 * column 3, lines 38-56 * * column 5, lines 35-39 * * column 6, lines 28,29 * * column 9, lines 31-40 *;
 [A]EP0634885  (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 4 *
ExaminationWO0072354