Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2642438

EP2642438 - Computer system for distributing a validation instruction message [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.06.2016
Database last updated on 23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2017New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pctfiler Holdings Pty Ltd
GPO Box 4726
Sydney, NSW 2001 / AU
[2013/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Simpson, Justin
Suite 307
24 Karrabee Avenue
Huntleys Cove
Sydney, New South Wales 2111 / AU
 [2013/39]
Representative(s)Korenberg, Alexander Tal , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
[2013/39]
Application number, filing date12170461.302.05.2006
[2013/39]
Priority number, dateAU2005090220003.05.2005         Original published format: AU 2005902200
[2013/39]
Previously filed application, dateWO2006AU0058202.05.2006
[2013/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2642438
Date:25.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP27.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/10, G06Q30/02
[2013/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2013/39]
TitleGerman:Computersystem zum Verteilen einer Validierungsanweisungsnachricht[2013/39]
English:Computer system for distributing a validation instruction message[2013/39]
French:Système informatique pour la distribution d'un message d'instruction de validation[2013/39]
Examination procedure08.03.2013Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
19.04.2013Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
24.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/18]
06.05.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
16.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06721461.9  / EP1889221
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
16.07.2014Request for further processing filed
16.07.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.07.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
01.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
01.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
01.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
01.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
24.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
28.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
16.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
15.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[L]  EPO, "Mitteilung des Europäischen Patentamts vom 1. Oktober 2007 über Geschäftsmethoden = Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 concerning business methods = Communiqué de l'Office européen des brevets,en date du 1er octobre 2007, concernant les méthodes dans le domaine des activités", JOURNAL OFFICIEL DE L'OFFICE EUROPEEN DES BREVETS.OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE.AMTSBLATTT DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS, OEB, MUNCHEN, DE, (20071101), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0170-9291, pages 592 - 593, XP007905525 [L] 1-19 * The claimed subject-matter, with due regard to the description and drawings in accordance with Article 92 EPC, relates to processes comprised in the list of subject-matter and activities excluded from patentability under Article 52(2) and (3) EPC. The information technology employed as an enabler for carrying out said processes is conventional. Its use for carrying out non-technical processes forms part of common general knowledge and it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing of the present application. No documentary evidence is therefore considered necessary. *