Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2530652

EP2530652 - Providing a single instance of a virtual space represented in either two dimensions or three dimensions via separate client computing devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.04.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
03.12.2019Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Disney Enterprises, Inc.
500 Buena Vista Street
Burbank, CA 91521 / US
[2012/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Hickman, Bob
603 Appleton Road
Simi Valley, CA California 93065 / US
02 / Jones, Allan. D
26911 Boulder Crest Drive
Valencia, CA California 91381 / US
 [2012/49]
Representative(s)Cabinet Beau de Loménie
158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/49]Potter, Julian Mark
WP Thompson
55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Application number, filing date12170599.001.06.2012
[2012/49]
Priority number, dateUS20111315187302.06.2011         Original published format: US201113151873
[2012/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2530652
Date:05.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06T19/00
[2012/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Bereitstellung einer einzelnen Instanz von virtuellem Raum, der in entweder zwei Dimensionen oder drei Dimensionen über separate Client-Rechnergeräte repräsentiert wird[2012/49]
English:Providing a single instance of a virtual space represented in either two dimensions or three dimensions via separate client computing devices[2012/49]
French:Fourniture d'une instance unique d'un espace virtuel représenté dans deux dimensions ou trois dimensions par l'intermédiaire de dispositifs informatiques clients séparés[2012/49]
Examination procedure15.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.07.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time
15.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/35]
08.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2014Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.11.2014
18.11.2014Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
28.11.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination19.12.2014Appeal received No.  T0887/15
07.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
30.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.10.2013
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
MK, EE, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
17.07.2013Request for further processing filed
17.07.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.07.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
17.07.2013Request for further processing filed
17.07.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.07.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
17.07.2013Request for further processing filed
17.07.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.07.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
29.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[I]US2010146085  (VAN WIE DAVID [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs: [0099], [0100], [0116], [0126], [0136], [0137], [0142], [0272], [0273], figures: 4-5C *;
 [A]  - Christian Kray ET AL, "Presenting Route Instructions on Mobile Devices", IUI 03. 2003 International Conference on Intelligent User Interfaces, (20030112), URL: http://reference.kfupm.edu.sa/content/p/r/presenting_route_instructions_on_mobile__54520.pdf, (20121008), XP055040252 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * section: "selecting a presentation" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/604045.604066
 [A]  - Unknown, "The Maze War 30 Year Retrospective at the DigiBarn", (20060219), URL: http://www.digibarn.com/collections/games/xerox-maze-war/index.html, (20121008), XP055040247 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *