Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2526979

EP2526979 - Enhanced signal detection for access disconnection systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.09.2016
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baxter International Inc.
One Baxter Parkway
Deerfield, IL 60015-4633 / US
For all designated states
Baxter Healthcare S.A.
Thurgauerstrasse 130
8152 Glattpark (Opfikon) / CH
[2012/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Roger, Rodolfo G
3123 Hyde Park Drive
Clearwater, FL Florida 33761 / US
02 / Hartranft, Thomas P
2658 Meadow Wood Drive
Clearwater, FL Florida 33761 / US
03 / Wariar, Ramesh
11036 Nassau Circle NE
Blaine, MN Minnesota 55449-5489 / US
04 / Lasso, Angel M
16101 Copeland Farms Road
Odessa, FL Florida 33556-3281 / US
05 / Lamberson, George T
7003 Autumn Park
San Antonio TX 78249 / US
 [2012/48]
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/44]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2013/37]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2012/48]Dee, Ian Mark
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Application number, filing date12170615.417.01.2008
[2012/48]
Priority number, dateUS2007067611016.02.2007         Original published format: US 676110
[2012/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2526979
Date:28.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2526979
Date:28.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/168, A61M39/10, G01N33/49, A61M1/16, G01N27/07, G01N27/10, A61M1/34, A61M1/36
[2015/23]
Former International [2012/48]A61M1/16, A61M1/34, A61M1/36, G01N27/07, G01N27/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/48]
TitleGerman:Verbesserte Signalerkennung für Zugangstrennungssysteme[2012/48]
English:Enhanced signal detection for access disconnection systems[2012/48]
French:Perfectionnement d'un système de détection de signal de déconnection d'accès[2015/25]
Former [2012/48]Perfectionement d'un système de détection de signal de déconnection d'accès.
Examination procedure01.06.2012Examination requested  [2012/48]
28.05.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2015Fee for grant paid
18.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08727811.5  / EP2121072
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080727811) is  04.06.2010
Opposition(s)29.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
01.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
01.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
25.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.01.2008
AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
BG28.10.2015
CY28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
TR28.10.2015
IE17.01.2016
LU17.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/31]HU17.01.2008
AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
CY28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
TR28.10.2015
IE17.01.2016
LU17.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2018/29]HU17.01.2008
AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
CY28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MT28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
TR28.10.2015
IE17.01.2016
LU17.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2018/28]HU17.01.2008
AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
CY28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MT28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
IE17.01.2016
LU17.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2017/47]AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MT28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
IE17.01.2016
LU17.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2017/07]AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
IE17.01.2016
LU17.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2017/03]AT28.10.2015
BE28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
LU17.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/49]AT28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
LU17.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/46]AT28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
LU17.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/42]AT28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
LU17.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/39]AT28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
LU17.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/36]AT28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/34]AT28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/25]AT28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/24]AT28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/23]HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
Former [2016/22]LT28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
Former [2016/21]LT28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
Former [2016/20]LT28.10.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003195453  (HAN JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0050] - [0055]; figure 2b * * paragraphs [0043] - [0055] *;
 [X]WO0147581  (HOSPAL AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 6, line 3 - line 38; figure 3 *;
 [A]US2004254513  (SHANG SHERWIN [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * figure 3 *;
 [A]US6153109  (KRIVITSKI NIKOLAI [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2006138359  (ROSS EDWARD ALLAN [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0050] , [0014]; figure 4 *
by applicantUS6143181
 US6372848
 US6255396
 US6623638
 US2003075498
 US6309673
 US6319243
 US5431496
 US20010955248
 US20030628065
 US20020044234
 US19930033233