blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2536075

EP2536075 - Method for requesting access by a terminal to digital content suitable for being downloaded from a network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.03.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.04.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Orange
78 Rue Olivier de Serres
75015 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2020/27]For all designated states
ORANGE
78 rue Olivier de Serres
75015 Paris / FR
Former [2013/39]For all designated states
Orange
78, rue Olivier de Serres
75015 Paris / FR
Former [2012/51]For all designated states
FRANCE TELECOM
6 place d'Alleray
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Bouvet, Eric
FRANCE TELECOM
3, rue des Tilleuls
35520 MONTREUIL LE GAST / FR
02 / Duvivier, Philippe
FRANCE TELECOM
9, la Bosserie Sainte Anne
35133 ROMAGNE / FR
 [2012/51]
Application number, filing date12170699.804.06.2012
[2012/51]
Priority number, dateFR2011005516214.06.2011         Original published format: FR 1155162
[2012/51]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2536075
Date:19.12.2012
Language:FR
[2012/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2536075
Date:20.05.2020
Language:FR
[2020/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.07.2012
ClassificationIPC:H04L12/70, H04N21/442, H04N21/472, H04L12/801, H04L29/06, H04N21/44
[2020/02]
CPC:
H04L47/10 (EP); H04L65/612 (EP); H04L65/613 (EP);
H04L65/762 (EP); H04L65/80 (EP); H04N21/44004 (EP);
H04N21/44209 (EP); H04N21/47202 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2012/51]H04L12/56, H04L29/06, H04N21/44
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/21]
Former [2012/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Anfrage um Zugriffsberechtigung über ein Endgerät auf einen digitalen Inhalt, der über ein Netz heruntergeladen werden kann[2012/51]
English:Method for requesting access by a terminal to digital content suitable for being downloaded from a network[2012/51]
French:Procédé de demande d'accès par un terminal à un contenu numérique apte à être téléchargé depuis un réseau.[2012/51]
Examination procedure19.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/35]
30.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2020Fee for grant paid
06.04.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.04.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.04.2018
Opposition(s)23.02.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.06.2012
AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CY20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
ES20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
IT20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
MC20.05.2020
MK20.05.2020
MT20.05.2020
NL20.05.2020
PL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SI20.05.2020
SK20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
TR20.05.2020
IE04.06.2020
LU04.06.2020
BE30.06.2020
CH30.06.2020
LI30.06.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/27]HU04.06.2012
AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CY20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
ES20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
IT20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
MC20.05.2020
MT20.05.2020
NL20.05.2020
PL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SI20.05.2020
SK20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
TR20.05.2020
IE04.06.2020
LU04.06.2020
BE30.06.2020
CH30.06.2020
LI30.06.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2022/26]AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
ES20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
IT20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
MC20.05.2020
NL20.05.2020
PL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SI20.05.2020
SK20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
TR20.05.2020
IE04.06.2020
LU04.06.2020
BE30.06.2020
CH30.06.2020
LI30.06.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2021/24]AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
ES20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
IT20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
MC20.05.2020
NL20.05.2020
PL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SI20.05.2020
SK20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
IE04.06.2020
LU04.06.2020
BE30.06.2020
CH30.06.2020
LI30.06.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2021/20]AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
ES20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
IT20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
MC20.05.2020
NL20.05.2020
PL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SK20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
IE04.06.2020
LU04.06.2020
CH30.06.2020
LI30.06.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2021/15]AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
ES20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
IT20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
MC20.05.2020
NL20.05.2020
PL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SK20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
LU04.06.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2021/13]AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
ES20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
IT20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
MC20.05.2020
NL20.05.2020
PL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SK20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2021/10]AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
ES20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
IT20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
NL20.05.2020
PL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SK20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2021/09]AL20.05.2020
AT20.05.2020
CZ20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
EE20.05.2020
ES20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
IT20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
NL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2021/08]AL20.05.2020
DK20.05.2020
ES20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
NL20.05.2020
RO20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
SM20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2021/04]AL20.05.2020
FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
NL20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2021/01]FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
BG20.08.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2020/51]FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
RS20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2020/50]FI20.05.2020
HR20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
LV20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
NO20.08.2020
GR21.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI20.05.2020
LT20.05.2020
SE20.05.2020
NO20.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
PT21.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT20.05.2020
NO20.08.2020
IS20.09.2020
Former [2020/46]IS20.09.2020
Documents cited:Search[A]US2002120747  (FRERICHS DAVID J [US], et al) [A] 1-11* abstract *;
 [X]WO2004039034  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1, line 26 - page 3, line 19 *;
 [A]US2004264489  (KLEMETS ANDERS E [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0055] - [0067] - [ 0073] - [0083] *;
 [A]EP1826980  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0053] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.