Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2497654

EP2497654 - Hose system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.05.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eclipse International AG
Steinmüristrasse 9
8123 Ebmatingen / CH
[2012/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Bauer, Andreas
Steinmüristrasse 9
8123 Ebmatingen / CH
 [2012/37]
Representative(s)Schmidt, Steffen J. , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/37]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date12170728.502.02.2010
[2012/37]
Priority number, dateDE2009100716303.02.2009         Original published format: DE102009007163
[2012/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2497654
Date:12.09.2012
Language:DE
[2012/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2497654
Date:03.09.2014
Language:DE
[2014/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2012
ClassificationInternational:B60C5/04, B60C29/04
[2012/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/37]
TitleGerman:Schlauchsystem[2012/37]
English:Hose system[2012/37]
French:Système de boyau[2012/37]
Examination procedure28.02.2013Examination requested  [2013/15]
18.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2014Fee for grant paid
24.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10702834.2  / EP2389296
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100702834) is  12.12.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.03.2015  09.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67058 Ludwigshafen / DE
 [2015/20]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
10.07.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.11.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.04.2017Date of oral proceedings
29.05.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
29.05.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition27.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1497/17
09.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
15.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.02.2010
BG03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
MK03.09.2014
MT03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
SM03.09.2014
TR03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE02.02.2015
LU02.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
AT02.02.2016
GB02.02.2016
FR29.02.2016
[2018/31]
Former [2017/38]HU02.02.2010
BG03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
MT03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
SM03.09.2014
TR03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE02.02.2015
LU02.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
AT02.02.2016
GB02.02.2016
FR29.02.2016
Former [2017/10]CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
MT03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE02.02.2015
LU02.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
AT02.02.2016
GB02.02.2016
FR29.02.2016
Former [2017/08]CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
MT03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE02.02.2015
LU02.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
AT02.02.2016
GB02.02.2016
Former [2017/03]CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
MT03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE02.02.2015
LU02.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
AT02.02.2016
Former [2016/50]CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE02.02.2015
LU02.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
AT02.02.2016
Former [2016/07]CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
IE02.02.2015
LU02.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/50]CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
LU02.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/46]CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
LU02.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/44]CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
LU02.02.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/37]CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
IT03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/35]CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/30]CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/24]CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/23]CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/22]CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/16]CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
HR03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
NO03.12.2014
Former [2015/09]FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT03.09.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0090222  (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * page 8, line 1 - page 10, line 24; claim 7; table 1 *;
 [A]GB2329162  (CHUKS HENRY [GB]) [A] 1-8 * page 1, paragraph l *;
 [A]JPS5544832  (NAT TIRE KK) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [A]DE807485  (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB191013467  (BANE JOSEPH, et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB446281  (HUBERT HENRY BURTON, et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
by applicantEP0090222
 GB2329162
 JPS5544832
 DE807485
 GB191013467
 GB446281