Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2533173

EP2533173 - Method for determining the location of a moving RFID tag [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2015
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universita' Degli Studi di Pisa
Lungarno Pacinotti 43/44
56126 Pisa / IT
[2012/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Nepa, Paolo
Via G. Caruso 16
56122 Pisa / IT
02 / Lombardini, Fabrizio
Via G. Caruso 16
56122 Pisa / IT
03 / Buffi, Alice
Via G. Caruso 16
56122 Pisa / IT
 [2012/50]
Representative(s)Lunati & Mazzoni S.r.L.
Via Carlo Pisacane, 36
20129 Milano / IT
[2012/50]
Application number, filing date12171018.006.06.2012
[2012/50]
Priority number, dateIT2011MI0101707.06.2011         Original published format: IT MI20111017
[2012/50]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2533173
Date:12.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2533173
Date:02.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/00, G01S13/75, G01S13/82, G01S13/84
[2013/46]
Former International [2012/50]G06K7/00, G01S13/84
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/50]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Ortsbestimmung eines sich bewegenden RFID Tags[2012/50]
English:Method for determining the location of a moving RFID tag[2012/50]
French:Procédé pour localiser un transpondeur RFID en mouvement[2012/50]
Examination procedure25.03.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2013Examination requested  [2013/18]
05.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.2014Fee for grant paid
19.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.11.2013
Opposition(s)06.01.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/11]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.06.2012
AL02.04.2014
AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
MK02.04.2014
MT02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SI02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
SM02.04.2014
TR02.04.2014
IE06.06.2014
LU06.06.2014
BG02.07.2014
NO02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
RS19.11.2014
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU06.06.2012
AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
MK02.04.2014
MT02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SI02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
SM02.04.2014
TR02.04.2014
IE06.06.2014
LU06.06.2014
BG02.07.2014
NO02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
RS19.11.2014
Former [2016/33]HU06.06.2012
AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
MT02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SI02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
SM02.04.2014
TR02.04.2014
IE06.06.2014
LU06.06.2014
BG02.07.2014
NO02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
RS19.11.2014
Former [2016/32]HU06.06.2012
AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
MT02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SI02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
SM02.04.2014
IE06.06.2014
LU06.06.2014
BG02.07.2014
NO02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
RS19.11.2014
Former [2016/22]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
MT02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SI02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
SM02.04.2014
IE06.06.2014
LU06.06.2014
BG02.07.2014
NO02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
RS19.11.2014
Former [2016/16]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
MT02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SI02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
IE06.06.2014
LU06.06.2014
BG02.07.2014
NO02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
RS19.11.2014
Former [2015/36]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SI02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
IE06.06.2014
LU06.06.2014
BG02.07.2014
NO02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
RS19.11.2014
Former [2015/24]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
IE06.06.2014
LU06.06.2014
BG02.07.2014
NO02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
RS19.11.2014
Former [2015/21]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
RS02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
IE06.06.2014
LU06.06.2014
BG02.07.2014
NO02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
Former [2015/11]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RO02.04.2014
RS02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
LU06.06.2014
BG02.07.2014
NO02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
Former [2015/10]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
EE02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RS02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
SK02.04.2014
LU06.06.2014
BG02.07.2014
NO02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
Former [2015/09]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
MC02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RS02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
LU06.06.2014
BG02.07.2014
NO02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
Former [2015/08]AT02.04.2014
BE02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
DK02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RS02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
NO02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
Former [2015/02]AT02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RS02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
NO02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
PT04.08.2014
Former [2014/52]AT02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
RS02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
NO02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
Former [2014/51]AT02.04.2014
CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
NO02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
ES02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
HR02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
LV02.04.2014
NL02.04.2014
PL02.04.2014
SE02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
NO02.07.2014
GR03.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
FI02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
NO02.07.2014
IS02.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY02.04.2014
CZ02.04.2014
LT02.04.2014
BG02.07.2014
Former [2014/47]CY02.04.2014
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2006099148  (ALIEN TECHNOLOGY CORP [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4-10 * page 17, line 20 - page 19, line 27; figures 4,13-15; claims 1-5 *