Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2533173 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2533173



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 159
06.02.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.04.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
06.03.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.02.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.02.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
18.02.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
18.02.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
05.11.2013 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
05.11.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.11.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.11.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.11.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
29.04.2013 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
25.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.03.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
25.03.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
25.03.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
25.03.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
25.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.03.2013 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
17.12.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
14.11.2012 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
17.10.2012 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
27.09.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.09.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 3
27.09.2012 European search report Search / examination 2
20.09.2012 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
29.06.2012 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
29.06.2012 Priority document Search / examination 29
28.06.2012 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 7
27.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.06.2012 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.06.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
27.06.2012 Description Search / examination 12
27.06.2012 Drawings Search / examination 6
27.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.06.2012 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
06.06.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.06.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.06.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.06.2012 Drawings Search / examination 6
06.06.2012 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
06.06.2012 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 17