Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2533173


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
18.03.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.04.2016  [2016/16]
31.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
08.05.2015 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
17.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
06.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
06.02.2015 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
30.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
23.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
16.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
05.12.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
21.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
14.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
07.11.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.12.2014  [2014/50]
31.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
17.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
28.02.2014 (Expected) grant published on  02.04.2014  [2014/14]
22.02.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
22.02.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
04.11.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.10.2013 Change - classification published on  13.11.2013  [2013/46]
11.10.2013 Change - classification published on  13.11.2013  [2013/46]
02.04.2013 Amendment by applicant
29.03.2013 Request for examination filed published on  01.05.2013  [2013/18]
11.12.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.12.2012  [2012/50]