Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2570983

EP2570983 - On-line auction method and server [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.01.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lee, Jeonggab
101-710 Mido Apt.
Daechi-dong
Gangnam-gu, Seoul 135-775 / KR
[2013/12]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2013/12]
Representative(s)Beyer, Andreas
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/28]Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Former [2013/12]Hutter, Jacobus Johannes
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
J.W. Frisolaan 13
2517 JS The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date12171718.513.06.2012
[2013/12]
Priority number, dateKR2011009247214.09.2011         Original published format: KR 20110092472
[2013/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2570983
Date:20.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/08
[2013/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Online Auktionsverfahren und Server[2013/12]
English:On-line auction method and server[2013/12]
French:Serveur et procédé de vente aux enchères en ligne[2013/12]
Examination procedure22.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/35]
28.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2016Date of oral proceedings
05.08.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
05.08.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination14.09.2016Appeal received No.  T0006/17
05.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.07.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
20.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
20.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[I]US2010217680  (FUSZ EUGENE A [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008]; figure 1 *;
 [I]WO2010102350  (SYDNEY FAMILY SUPERANNUATION F [AU], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0057] - [0059] - [ 169]; figure 1 *