Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2544354

EP2544354 - Power converter circuit with AC output [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.01.2020
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
Am Campeon 1-12
85579 Neubiberg / DE
[2013/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Deboy, Gerald
Pitzelstättenweg 64
9061 Klagenfurt / AT
02 / Bründlinger, Roland
Furtmüllerstrasse 6
2000 Stockerau / AT
03 / Andrén, Filip
Columbusgasse 44/10
1100 Wien / AT
04 / Lehfuß, Felix
Hauptstraße 119/1/30
3021 Pressbaum / AT
 [2013/02]
Representative(s)Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Werinherstrasse 79
81541 München / DE
[2019/10]
Former [2013/02]Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Herzog-Wilhelm-Strasse 26
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date12172429.818.06.2012
[2013/02]
Priority number, dateUS20111317873008.07.2011         Original published format: US201113178730
[2013/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2544354
Date:09.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2544354
Date:29.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2544354
Date:06.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02M7/525, H02M1/42, H02M3/158, H02M7/539
[2015/31]
Former International [2013/02]H02M7/525
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/10]
Former [2013/02]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Stromwandlerschaltung mit Wechselstromausgabe[2013/02]
English:Power converter circuit with AC output[2013/02]
French:Circuit convertisseur de puissance à sortie CA[2013/02]
Examination procedure29.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/10]
07.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
08.01.2019Fee for grant paid
08.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.01.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
23.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.11.2016
Opposition(s)09.12.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
17.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
07.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201504   M06   Fee paid on   20.07.2015
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL06.03.2019
AT06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
DK06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
MC06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
IS06.07.2019
PT06.07.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2020/08]AL06.03.2019
AT06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
MC06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
IS06.07.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2020/04]AL06.03.2019
AT06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
IS06.07.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2020/03]AL06.03.2019
AT06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/52]AL06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
PL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
SM06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/49]AL06.03.2019
CZ06.03.2019
EE06.03.2019
ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RO06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
SK06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/48]ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
PT06.07.2019
Former [2019/47]ES06.03.2019
FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[XY]JP2010279133  (NTT FACILITIES INC) [X] 17 * abstract * [Y] 1-16,18-22;
 [XY]JPH1084633  (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 17 * abstract * [Y] 1-16,18-22;
 [Y]EP0216263  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 4 * page 6, lines 16-18; figure 3 *;
 [Y]JPH10304572  (HITACHI LTD; HITACHI KEIYO ENG) [Y] 4 * abstract *;
 [X]JP2000069671  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 17 * abstract *
 [XY]  - ALONSO O ET AL, "Cascaded h-bridge multilevel converter for grid connected photovoltaic generators with independent maximum power point tracking of each solar array", PESC'03. 2003 IEEE 34TH. ANNUAL POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE. CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. ACAPULCO, MEXICO, JUNE 15 - 19, 2003; [ANNUAL POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE], NEW YORK, NY :; IEEE, US, (20030615), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/PESC.2003.1218146, ISBN 978-0-7803-7754-7, pages 731 - 735, XP010648900 [X] 1,12,17,20 * Section V;; figures 2-7 * [Y] 2-11,13-16,18,19,21,22

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PESC.2003.1218146
 [Y]  - WALKER G R ET AL, "Cascaded DC-DC converter connection of photovoltaic modules", POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE; [ANNUAL POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE],, (20020623), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-7262-7, pages 24 - 29, XP010596060 [Y] 1-16,18-22 * Section III.C;; figures 1,6 *
ExaminationCN102035416
 US2005226017