Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2511544

EP2511544 - Retainer segment of roller bearing for supporting main shaft of wind-power generator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2012/42]Roller bearing, retainer segment of roller bearing for supporting main shaft of wind-power generator, and main shaft support structure of wind-power generator
[2013/41]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.12.2016
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
21.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTN Corporation
3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome, Nishi-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP
[2012/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Omoto, Tatsuya
NTN Corporation
3066 Aza Oyumida Oaza Higashikata
Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-0811 / JP
02 / Nakamizo, Eiichi
NTN Corporation
3066 Aza Oyumida Oaza Higashikata
Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-0811 / JP
03 / Sakaguchi, Tomoya
NTN Corporation
3066 Aza Oyumida Oaza Higashikata
Kuwana-shi, Mie 511-0811 / JP
 [2012/42]
Representative(s)Bockhorni & Brüntjen Partnerschaft Patentanwälte mbB
Elsenheimerstraße 49
80687 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/42]Bockhorni & Kollegen
Elsenheimerstraße 49
80687 München / DE
Application number, filing date12175578.904.09.2007
[2012/42]
Priority number, dateJP2006024439608.09.2006         Original published format: JP 2006244396
JP2006024439708.09.2006         Original published format: JP 2006244397
JP2006035246227.12.2006         Original published format: JP 2006352462
JP2007014835204.06.2007         Original published format: JP 2007148352
JP2007014835304.06.2007         Original published format: JP 2007148353
[2012/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2511544
Date:17.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2511544
Date:29.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:F16C19/38, F03D11/04, F16C33/36, F16C35/063
[2012/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   FR [2012/42]
TitleGerman:Halteteil für Hauptwellenstützrollenlager eines Windkraftwerks[2013/41]
English:Retainer segment of roller bearing for supporting main shaft of wind-power generator[2013/41]
French:Segment d'arrêt pour roulement à rouleaux de support d'arbre principal d'aérogénérateur[2013/41]
Former [2012/42]Rollenlager, Halteteil für Hauptwellenstützrollenlager eines Windkraftwerks und Hauptwellenstützstruktur eines Windkraftwerks
Former [2012/42]Roller bearing, retainer segment of roller bearing for supporting main shaft of wind-power generator, and main shaft support structure of wind-power generator
Former [2012/42]Roulement à rouleaux, segment d'arrêt pour roulement à rouleaux de support d'arbre principal d'aérogénérateur et structure de support d'arbre principal d'aérogénérateur
Examination procedure09.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/42]
20.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2013Fee for grant paid
13.12.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP07806654.5  / EP2060806
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070806654) is  20.09.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.10.2014   
Aktiebolaget SKF
415 50 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Gentzel, Marcus, et al
Aktiebolaget SKF
SKF Patent Department Göteborg
415 50 Göteborg / SE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/49]
Opponent(s)01  28.10.2014   
Aktiebolaget SKF
415 50 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Gentzel, Marcus, et al
Aktiebolaget SKF
SKF Patent Department Göteborg
415 50 Göteborg / SE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
17.12.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.06.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
23.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.12.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition22.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0483/17
27.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
30.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
09.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
09.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
09.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
18.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[AD]EP1408248  (SKF AB [SE]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2005061434  (NSK LTD) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1,2,6,7,9,10 *;
 [A]JP2003336642  (KOYO SEIKO CO) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020]; figure 12 *;
 [A]JP2003278746  (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]  - J. T. MOTTRAM ET AL, "Thermal expansion of phenolic resin and phenolic-fibre composites", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, (19920101), vol. 27, no. 18, doi:10.1007/BF01105268, ISSN 0022-2461, pages 5015 - 5026, XP055007879 [A] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01105268
 [A]  - J. A. BARNES ET AL, "Thermal expansion characteristics of PEEK composites", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, (19910101), vol. 26, no. 8, doi:10.1007/BF00549197, ISSN 0022-2461, pages 2259 - 2271, XP055008085 [A] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00549197
 [A]  - J. A. BARNES, "Thermal expansion behaviour of thermoplastic composites", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, (19930101), vol. 28, no. 18, doi:10.1007/BF00361164, ISSN 0022-2461, pages 4974 - 4982, XP055008089 [A] 1-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00361164
by applicantEP1408248