Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2631760

EP2631760 - Method and apparatus for providing a user interface on a device enabling selection of operations to be performed in relation to content [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.07.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2019New entry: Receipt of observations in an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
[2013/48]
Former [2013/36]For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Thorsander, Simon Martin
c/o Research In Motion TAT AB
Torggatan 2
211 40 Malmö / SE
02 / Johansson, Per Åke Daniel
c/o Research In Motion TAT AB
Torggatan 2
211 40 Malmö / SE
03 / Andersson Reimer, Nils Roger
c/o Research In Motion TAT AB
Torggatan 2
211 40 Malmö / SE
04 / Lessing, Robert Simon
c/o Research In Motion TAT AB
Torggatan 2
211 40 Malmö / SE
05 / Arbsjö, Jonas Ove
c/o Research In Motion TAT AB
Torggatan 2
211 40 Malmö / SE
06 / Boman, Charles Anton Nilsson
c/o Research In Motion TAT AB
Torggatan 2
211 40 Malmö / SE
07 / Eldessouki, Ahmed ElSaeed Mohamed Gad
295 Phillip Street, Ext. 70510
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
08 / Drén, Andreas Pal
c/o Research In Motion TAT AB
Torggatan 2
211 40 Malmö / SE
 [2013/35]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/35]Finnie, Peter John
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date12176601.816.07.2012
[2013/35]
Priority number, dateUS201261602904P24.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261602904 P
[2013/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2631760
Date:28.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0482, G06F3/0488
[2013/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/35]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung einer Benutzerschnittstelle auf einer Vorrichtung zur Ermöglichung der Auswahl von durchzuführenden Vorgängen im Zusammenhang mit Inhalt[2013/35]
English:Method and apparatus for providing a user interface on a device enabling selection of operations to be performed in relation to content[2013/35]
French:Procédé et appareil pour fournir une interface utilisateur sur un dispositif permettant la sélection d'opérations devant être effectuées par rapport à un contenu[2013/35]
Examination procedure16.07.2012Examination requested  [2013/35]
28.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.08.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
08.07.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
08.07.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination08.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2740/16
07.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
02.07.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2019/27]
02.09.2019Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2019/36]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.04.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011087983  (SHIM SANG HOON [KR]) [X] 1-5,8,9,13-17 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0087] * * figure - * [I] 6,7,10-12;
 [XI]EP2284675  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-3,12-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0066] * * figure - * [I] 4-11;
 [XI]EP2079012  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-3,12-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0126] * * figure - * [I] 4-11;
 [XI]US2008168349  (LAMIRAUX HENRI C [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,12-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0284] - paragraph [0307] * * paragraph [0328] - paragraph [0336] * * figure - * [I] 4-11