Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2631760


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.09.2019 New entry: Receipt of observations in an appeal
31.07.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.06.2019 New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit
31.07.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.08.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.12.2016 Change: Appeal number
23.11.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
09.09.2016 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
09.09.2016 New entry: Appeal number
29.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.07.2016 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.07.2016 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
02.02.2016 Change - representative
08.12.2015 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
29.07.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.07.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
19.05.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.01.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.08.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
31.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.04.2014 First examination report
08.04.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.03.2014 Amendment by applicant
25.10.2013 Change - applicant published on  27.11.2013  [2013/48]
27.08.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.08.2013  [2013/35]
02.08.2013 Change - applicant published on  04.09.2013  [2013/36]
26.07.2013 Request for examination filed published on  28.08.2013  [2013/35]