Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2631760
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2013124467Global Dossier 29.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261602904 24.02.2012
EP12176601 16.07.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017364218Global Dossier 21.12.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201314028041 16.09.2013
US201261602904 24.02.2012
US201213550360 16.07.2012
US201715694573 01.09.2017
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9753611Global Dossier 05.09.2017B2
US2014047390 13.02.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314028041 16.09.2013
US201261602904 24.02.2012
US201213550360 16.07.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8539375Global Dossier 17.09.2013B1
US2013227482 29.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261602904 24.02.2012
US201213550360 16.07.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2865440 29.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261602904 24.02.2012
WO2013EP53637 22.02.2013
EP12176601 16.07.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE202012007708U 26.09.2012U1
Priority number Date
US201261602904 24.02.2012
EP12176601 16.07.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2631760Global Dossier 28.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261602904 24.02.2012