Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2548623

EP2548623 - Filter vessel assembly and related methods of use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hayward Industries, Inc.
620 Division Street
Elizabeth NJ 07201 / US
[2013/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Hoots, Joshua
157 Wildwood Place
Clemmons, NC North Carolina 27012 / US
02 / Stone, Jon
980 Boyer Drive
Clemmons, NC North Carolina 27012 / US
03 / Pace, Michael
145 Crowne Chase Drive
Apt. 9
Winston-Salem, NC North Carolina 27104 / US
 [2013/04]
Representative(s)Cross, James Peter Archibald , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/48]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2013/22]Lessard, Jason Donat , et al
Clifton Cowley Legal
25 Meer Street
Stratford-upon-Avon, Warks. CV37 6QB / GB
Former [2013/04]Lessard, Jason Donat
Hepworth Browne
29 Wood Street
Stratford-upon-Avon
Warwickshire, CV37 6JG / GB
Application number, filing date12177107.519.07.2012
[2013/04]
Priority number, dateUS201161509485P19.07.2011         Original published format: US 201161509485 P
[2013/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2548623
Date:23.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2548623
Date:07.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:B01D29/13, B01D29/27
[2013/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/04]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Filtergefäßanordnung und zugehörige Verwendungsverfahren[2013/04]
English:Filter vessel assembly and related methods of use[2013/04]
French:Ensemble de cuve de filtre et procédés d'utilisation associés[2013/04]
Examination procedure28.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/11]
05.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2019Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.05.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US4775469  (ZIMMERLY ROBERT D [US]) [X] 1,18-25,31 * figures 1,2,5,6 * [Y] 2-17,26,27,30 [I] 29,32;
 [Y]WO2010139706  (MANN & HUMMEL GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 2-17 * figures 4a,4b,4c *;
 [Y]US4157964  (RISHEL JOHN W [US]) [Y] 26,30 * figure 3 *;
 [Y]US5006243  (ARNAUD JOHNNY [US]) [Y] 26 * figures 5,6a,6b *;
 [Y]EP0937868  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [Y] 27 * figures 6,7 *
by applicantUS2081968
 US2106218
 US2156329
 US3931015
 US4253959
 US4419240
 US4721563
 US5624559