Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2548623 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2548623



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 800
09.12.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
03.12.2019 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
29.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.11.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 65
29.11.2019 Description Search / examination 48
29.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.11.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
25.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.11.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 64
25.11.2019 Description Search / examination 48
25.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.11.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 12
07.11.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
07.11.2019 Claims Search / examination 11
07.11.2019 Description Search / examination 2
07.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.11.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
25.10.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
25.10.2019 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
18.10.2019 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
04.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.10.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 12
04.10.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 12
04.10.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 11
04.10.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 12
04.10.2019 Claims Search / examination 11
04.10.2019 Claims Search / examination 11
04.10.2019 Claims Search / examination 11
04.10.2019 Claims Search / examination 10
04.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.10.2019 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 18
08.08.2019 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
06.08.2019 Communication about missing advice of delivery Search / examination 2
27.06.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
27.06.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
27.06.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
29.03.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.03.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
22.03.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
23.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 14
23.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 13
23.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.11.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
29.09.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
26.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.09.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.05.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
16.05.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.02.2017 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
26.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
05.02.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 13
05.02.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 13
05.02.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
05.02.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
05.02.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
28.01.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
28.01.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.10.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.10.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
18.10.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
17.10.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
12.08.2013 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
04.07.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
04.07.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 7
04.07.2013 European search report Search / examination 4
26.04.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.04.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 5
05.02.2013 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
31.01.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 122
11.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
11.01.2013 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
04.01.2013 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
07.11.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
07.11.2012 Partial European search report Search / examination 4
14.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.07.2012 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.07.2012 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
19.07.2012 Claims Search / examination 12
19.07.2012 Description Search / examination 65
19.07.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.07.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.07.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.07.2012 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.07.2012 Drawings Search / examination 61
19.07.2012 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4