blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2548623


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
31.07.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.06.2019 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
31.07.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.03.2018 Change - representative
28.11.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.09.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.08.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.05.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.05.2017 First examination report
29.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.07.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.02.2014 Amendment by applicant
07.02.2014 Request for examination filed published on  12.03.2014  [2014/11]
07.02.2014 Change - designated states published on  12.03.2014  [2014/11]
25.10.2013 Change - representative published on  27.11.2013  [2013/48]
05.07.2013 Publication of search report published on  07.08.2013  [2013/32]
05.07.2013 Change - classification published on  07.08.2013  [2013/32]
05.07.2013 Change - classification published on  07.08.2013  [2013/32]
26.04.2013 Change - representative published on  29.05.2013  [2013/22]
22.01.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.01.2013  [2013/04]