blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2548623
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9630127Global Dossier 25.04.2017B2
US2013020246 24.01.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201213547244 12.07.2012
US201161509485 19.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2987531Global Dossier 21.08.2018C
CA2987531 19.01.2013A1
Priority number Date
CA2783525 18.07.2012
US201213547244 12.07.2012
US201161509485 19.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2783525Global Dossier 24.04.2018C
CA2783525 19.01.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201213547244 12.07.2012
US201161509485 19.07.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2017254866 23.11.2017A2
AU2017254866 16.11.2017A1
Priority number Date
AU2012205149 16.07.2012
AU2017254866 31.10.2017
US201161509485 19.07.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2548623Global Dossier 07.08.2013A3
EP2548623 23.01.2013A2
Priority number Date
US201161509485 19.07.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU2012205149B 04.01.2018B2
AU2012205149 07.02.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161509485 19.07.2011