Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2549598

EP2549598 - Inexpensive variable rep-rate source for high-energy, ultrafast lasers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.08.2018  [2018/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Imra America, Inc.
1044 Woodridge Avenue
Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US
[2013/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Harter, Donald J.
3535 Sulgrave Place
Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US
02 / Uehara, Yuzuru
61-2 Shimonagare
Ushida
Chiryu
Aichi 472-0007 / JP
 [2016/06]
Former [2013/04]01 / Harter, Donald J.
3535 Sulgrave Place
Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US
02 / Uehara, Yuzuru
61-2 Shimonagare
Ushida
Chiryu
Aichi 472-007 / JP
Representative(s)Hartig, Michael
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/06]Hartig, Michael
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2013/04]Hartig, Michael
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date12177514.214.05.2004
[2013/04]
Priority number, dateUS2003043705714.05.2003         Original published format: US 437057
[2013/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2549598
Date:23.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2549598
Date:23.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2549598
Date:10.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01S3/23, H01S3/00, H01S3/067, // G02B6/293
[2013/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/06]
Former [2013/04]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kostengünstige Quelle mit variabler Impulsfolgefrequenz für ultraschnelle Hochleistungslaser[2013/04]
English:Inexpensive variable rep-rate source for high-energy, ultrafast lasers[2013/04]
French:Source de fréquence de récurrence variable bon marché pour lasers ultrarapides à énergie élevée[2013/04]
Examination procedure17.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/23]
08.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
08.07.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
30.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.2015Fee for grant paid
01.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04785507.7  / EP1627252
EP11176560.8  / EP2393170
Divisional application(s)EP16154800.3  / EP3070793
Opposition(s)11.11.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 11
12.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.05.2004
AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CY10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
TR10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IE14.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
PT13.06.2016
[2018/29]
Former [2018/28]HU14.05.2004
AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CY10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
MC10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IE14.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/38]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
IE14.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/16]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SI10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
BG10.05.2016
GR11.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/07]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
GR11.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
CH31.05.2016
LI31.05.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/04]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
GR11.05.2016
LU14.05.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2017/03]AT10.02.2016
BE10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
GR11.05.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/50]AT10.02.2016
CZ10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
RO10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
SK10.02.2016
GR11.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/49]AT10.02.2016
EE10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
GR11.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/39]AT10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
SE10.02.2016
GR11.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/38]AT10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
GR11.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
PT13.06.2016
Former [2016/36]AT10.02.2016
ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
IT10.02.2016
NL10.02.2016
PL10.02.2016
GR11.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/35]ES10.02.2016
FI10.02.2016
GR11.05.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE10124983  (IMRA AMERICA INC [US]) [X] 1,2,14,15 * paragraphs [0046] - [0051] - [0087] - [0090]; figure 14 * [I] 13;
 [X]US5541947  (MOUROU GERARD A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,14,15 * column 4, line 20 - column 8, line 67; figure 2 *;
 [A]US4646308  (KAFKA JAMES D [US], et al) [A] 7,8,12 * column 4, line 11 - column 5, line 25; figure 1 *;
 [AD]US6400495  (ZAYHOWSKI JOHN J [US]) [AD] 7,8 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 17 - line 39 * * column 5, line 14 - line 21 *;
 [ID]US4896326  (KAFKA JAMES D [US], et al) [ID] 1,10-12 * column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 49; figures 1,2,5 *;
 [I]  - PROVINO L ET AL, "Compact broadband continuum source based on microchip laser pumped microstructured fibre", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (20010426), vol. 37, no. 9, doi:10.1049/EL:20010395, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 558 - 560, XP006016516 [I] 1-6,12,15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:20010395
 [AD]  - BRAUN B, "56-PS PASSIVELY +-SWITCHED DIODE-PUMPED MICROCHIP LASER", OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19970315), vol. 22, no. 6, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 381 - 383, XP000690332 [AD] 5,6,9,15 * the whole document *
 [L]  - "Product Bulletin: NanoLaser (TM) Solid-state laser", (2002), URL: http://www.repairfaq.org/sam/brochures/JDnano2.pdf, (20120907), XP002683030 [L] 1 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - ZAYHOWSKI J J ET AL, "COUPLED-CAVITY ELECTRO-OPTICALLY Q-SWITCHED ND:YVO4 MICROCHIP LASERS", OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19950401), vol. 20, no. 7, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 716 - 718, XP000497429 [AD] 5,6,9,15 * the whole document *
 [XA]  - VOSS D F ET AL, "SIMULTANEOUS AMPLIFICATION AND COMPRESSION OF CONTINOUS-WAVE MODE- LOCKED ND:YAG LASER PULSES", OPTICS LETTERS, THE OPTICAL SOCIETY, (19860401), vol. 11, no. 4, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 210 - 212, XP000710387 [X] 1,10 * page 210 - page 211, column l, paragraph 1; figure 1 * [A] 7
 [A]  - LIMPERT J ET AL, "High-average-power millijoule fiber amplifier system", CONFERENCE ON LASERS AND ELECTRO-OPTICS. (CLEO 2002). TECHNICAL DIGEST. POSTCONFERENCE EDITION. LONG BEACH, CA, MAY 19 - 24, 2002; [TRENDS IN OPTICS AND PHOTONICS. (TOPS)], WASHINGTON, WA : OSA, US, (20020519), ISBN 978-1-55752-706-6, pages 591 - 592, XP010607105 [A] 13 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5400350
 US5880877
 US4750809
 US4896326
 US4913520
 US5818630
 US6421573
 US6373565
 US6436602
 US5633885
 US6400495
 US5553088
 US5627853
    - NAKAZAWA ET AL., "Ultrahigh-speed OTDM Transmission beyond 1 Tera Bit-Per-Second Using a Femtosecond Pulse Train", IECE TRANS. ELECTRON, (2002), vol. E38-C, pages 117 - 125, XP001116771
    - "Generation of 185fs pedestal-free pulses using a 1.55µm distributed feedback semiconductor laser", ELECTRONIC LETTERS, (1995), vol. 31, pages 195 - 196
    - K. TAMURA ET AL., "50 GHz repetition-rate, 280-fs pulse generation at 100mw average power from a mode-locked laser diode externally compressed in a pedestal-free pulse compressor", OPTICS LETTERS, (2002), vol. 27, pages 1268 - 70
    - NAKATSUKA ET AL., "Nonlinear Picosecond-Pulse Propagation through Optical Fibers with Positive Group Velocity Dispersion", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, (1981), vol. 47, doi:doi:10.1103/PhysRevLett.47.910, pages 910 - 913, XP055004038

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.47.910
    - FORK ET AL., "Compression of optical pulses to six femtoseconds by using cubic phase compensation", OPTICS LETTERS, (1987), vol. 12, pages 483 - 5
    - DIANOV, "Generation of high-contrast subpicopulses by single-stage 110-fold compression of YAG:Nd3+ laser pulses", SOVIET JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, (1987), vol. 17, doi:doi:10.1070/QE1987v017n04ABEH007765, pages 415 - 416, XP000709103

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1070/QE1987v017n04ABEH007765
    - ZYSST ET AL., "200- femtosecond pulses at 1.06 µm generated with a double-stage pulse compressor", OPTICS LETTERS, (1986), vol. 11, pages 156 - 8, XP000710378
    - DAMM ET AL., "Compression of picosecond pulses from a solid-state laser using self-phase modulation in graded-index fibers", OPTICS LETTERS, (1985), vol. 10, pages 176 - 8
    - ZAYHOWSKI ET AL., "Diode-pumped passively Q-switched picosecond microchip lasers", OPTICS LETTERS, (1994), vol. 19, pages 1427 - 29, XP000445454
    - ZAYHOWSKI ET AL., "Coupled-cavity electro-optically Q-switched NdYV04 microchip lasers", OPTICS LETTERS, (1995), vol. 20, pages 716 - 8, XP000497429
    - BRAUN ET AL., "56-ps passively Q-switched diode-pumped microchip laser", OPTICS LETTERS, (1997), vol. 22, pages 381 - 2
    - KUCKKARTZ ET AL., "Operation of a fiber-grating compressor in the Raman regime", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY B, (1988), vol. 5, pages 1353 - 1359
    - "S-band Erbium-Doped Fiber Amplifiers for WDM Transmission Between 1488 and 1508nm", ARBORE ET AL., OSA Trends in Optics and Photonics (TOPS) Vol. 86, Optical Fiber Communication Conference, Postconference Edition, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (2003), vol. 86, pages 374 - 376
    - ETSUKO ISHIKAWA ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF ECOC, (2001), page 2001
    - MESTADAGH, D., "Fiber-grating pulse compressor: Performance with initially chirped pulses", APPLIED OPTICS, (1987), vol. 26, doi:doi:10.1364/AO.26.005234, pages 5234 - 5240, XP000619133

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.26.005234
    - KNUDSEN, S., "Design and manufacture of dispersion compensating fibers and their performance in systems", PROC. OF OFC '02, PAPER WU3, (2002), pages 330 - 331
    - TOMLINSON ET AL., "Limits of fiber-grating optical pulse compression", JOSAB, (1987), vol. 4, pages 1404 - 11
    - WILLIAMS, "The compression of optical pulses using self-phase modulation and linearly chirped Bragg-gratings in fibers", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY, (1995), doi:doi:10.1109/68.384520, pages 491 - 3, XP000506789

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.384520
    - KWON ET AL., "Group-delay-tailored chirped fiber Bragg gratings using a tapered elastic plate", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (2002), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1109/LPT.2002.802388, pages 1433 - 1435, XP011426891

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LPT.2002.802388
    - HERITAGE, "Spectral windowing of frequency-modulated optical pulses in a grating compressor", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, (1985), vol. 47, page 8789
    - TOMLINSON ET AL., "Compression of optical pulses chirped by self-phase modulation in fibers", JOURNAL - OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA B, (1984), pages 139 - 149, XP002316357
    - KAFKA ET AL., "Peak power fluctuations in optical pulse compression", IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, (1988), vol. 24, doi:doi:10.1109/3.131, pages 341 - 50, XP011478359

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/3.131
    - FURUSAWA ET AL., "Cladding pumped Ytterbium-doped fiber laser with holey inner and outer cladding", OPTICS EXPRESS, (2001), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1364/OE.9.000714, pages 714 - 720, XP001153793

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.9.000714
    - THURSTON ET AL., "Analysis of picosecond pulse shape synthesis by spectral masking in a grating pulse compressor", IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, QE-22, (1986), doi:doi:10.1109/JQE.1986.1073009, pages 682 - 696, XP000705589

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JQE.1986.1073009
    - "Short pulse generation from Ti:doped Mateiials", HARTER ET AL., Digest of Conference on Lasers and Electro-Optics, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, (1988), pages 466 - 7
    - ZAYHOWSKI ET AL., "Gain-switched pulsed operation of microchip lasers", OPTICS LETTERS, vol. 14, pages 1318 - 20, XP000081936
 US20000576772