Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2533130

EP2533130 - Method and system for enhancing computer peripheral saftey [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.10.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ardent Sound, Inc.
33 South Sycamore Street
Mesa, AZ 85202-1105 / US
[2012/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Jaeger, Paul M
8134 East Willetta
Mesa, AZ 85283 / US
02 / Vadim, Kouklev
995 East Baseline Road, Suite 2032
Tempe, AZ 85283 / US
03 / Slayton, Michael H
1323 East Whalers Way
Tempe, AZ 85283 / US
04 / Barthe, Peter G
15002 South 30th Street
Phoenix, AZ 85048 / US
 [2012/50]
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/50]Curley, Donnacha John , et al
Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date12178124.925.04.2006
[2012/50]
Priority number, dateUS20050674964P25.04.2005         Original published format: US 674964 P
[2012/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2533130
Date:12.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/26, H02H7/20
[2012/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2012/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Verbesserung der peripheren Computersicherheit[2012/50]
English:Method and system for enhancing computer peripheral saftey[2012/50]
French:Procédé et système pour améliorer la sécurité de périphérique d'ordinateur[2012/50]
Examination procedure12.06.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.06.2013Examination requested  [2013/30]
12.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.04.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
21.04.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination21.06.2016Appeal received No.  T2181/16
18.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06751473.7  / EP1875327
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
26.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
26.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
29.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
29.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
28.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
28.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
26.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
26.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[I]US5540235  (WILSON JOHN R [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * column 4, line 48 - column 6, line 41; figures 1,2A,2B *;
 [A]DE4029175  (LAUERER FRIEDRICH [DE]) [A] 1-4,7-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 37 *;
 [A]US5615091  (PALATNIK EUGENE S [US]) [A] 1-4,7-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 1, line 45 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US2002040442  (ISHIDERA NOBUTAKA [JP]) [A] 1,2,5,11 * abstract * * figures 1,2,5,6 *;
 [A]US6665806  (SHIMIZU YUTAKA [JP]) [A] 1,2,5,11 * abstract * * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 12 *;
 [A]US2003200481  (STANLEY RANDY P [US]) [A] 6 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 8 - page 2, paragraph 19; figure 2 *;
 [A]JPH09187428  (ALOKA CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US5671738  (THOERNBERG BENNY [SE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6440071