Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2555126

EP2555126 - System and method for accessing rich objects via spreadsheets [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.11.2014
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Palantir Technologies, Inc.
100 Hamilton Avenue
Suite 300
Palo Alto, California 94301 / US
[N/P]
Former [2013/06]For all designated states
Palantir Technologies, Inc.
100 Hamilton Avenue Suite 300
Palo Alto, California 94301 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Cicerone, Derek Michael
15 Little West 12th Street 5
New York, NY 10014-1393 / US
 [2013/06]
Representative(s)Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Leonrodstraße 58
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/06]Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Leonrodstrasse 58
80636 München / DE
Application number, filing date12179096.802.08.2012
[2013/06]
Priority number, dateUS20111319678802.08.2011         Original published format: US201113196788
[2013/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2555126
Date:06.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2555126
Date:24.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/24, G06F17/27
[2013/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zum Zugriff auf reiche Objekte über Kalkulationstabellen[2013/06]
English:System and method for accessing rich objects via spreadsheets[2013/06]
French:Système et procédé permettant d'accéder à des objets sémantiquement riches via des tableurs[2013/06]
Examination procedure24.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2013Examination requested  [2013/49]
03.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.05.2017
04.05.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
15.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination21.07.2017Appeal received No.  T2496/17
20.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.07.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
05.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1672527  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 3-9 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0016] *;
 [I]US2002095658  (SHULMAN MATTHEW [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 3 * * figure 7 * * column 4, line 46 - line 65 *;
 [A]US5845300  (COMER ROSS WARD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 3a-i *