Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2695918

EP2695918 - COATING COMPOSITION FOR THE PREVENTION AND/OR REMOVAL OF LIMESCALE AND/OR SOAP SCUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/07]Coating composition for the prevention and/or removal of limescale and/or soap scum
[2017/31]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.07.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.05.2018  [2018/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/07]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Strerath, Christiane
3M Deutschland GmbH
Carl-Schurz-Str. 1
41453 Neuss / DE
02 / Jing, Naiyong
3M Company
P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
03 / Zhang, Yifan
3M Company
P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
04 / Legatt, Michelle L.
3M Company
P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
05 / Wolk, Diane R.
3M Company
P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
 [2014/07]
Representative(s)Gabriel, Kiroubagaranne , et al
3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L.
Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/07]Gabriel, Kiroubagaranne , et al
3M Europe S.A.
Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
Application number, filing date12179506.607.08.2012
[2014/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2695918
Date:12.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:C09D7/12, B08B17/02
[2014/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERMEIDUNG UND/ODER ZUM ENTFERNEN VON KALKABLAGERUNGEN UND/ODER SEIFENSCHAUM[2017/31]
English:COATING COMPOSITION FOR THE PREVENTION AND/OR REMOVAL OF LIMESCALE AND/OR SOAP SCUM[2017/31]
French:COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT POUR LA PRÉVENTION ET/OU L'ÉLIMINATION DES DÉPÔTS CALCAIRES ET/OU DE LA MOUSSE DE SAVON[2017/31]
Former [2014/07]Beschichtungszusammensetzung zur Vermeidung und/oder zum Entfernen von Kalkablagerungen und/oder Seifenschaum
Former [2014/07]Coating composition for the prevention and/or removal of limescale and/or soap scum
Former [2014/07]Composition de revêtement pour la prévention et/ou l'élimination des dépôts calcaires et/ou de la mousse de savon
Examination procedure12.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/38]
25.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/21]
05.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/21]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.08.2015
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
24.03.2017Request for further processing filed
24.03.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.04.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XD]US2010092765  (HAGER PATRICK J [US], et al) [XD] 1-4 * paragraphs [0015] , [0055] , [0063] , [0071] , [0092] - [0095] *;
 [XD]WO2010114698  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [XD] 5-23 * page 3, line 13 - line 18 * * page 9, line 28 - line 29 * * page 13, line 14 * * claims 1,2,3,7 *;
 [A]DE102006061327  (BASF CONSTR POLYMERS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0022]; claims 1,4,8 *
 [X]  - YOUNG-KWON OH ET AL, "Synthesis of Super-hydrophilic Mesoporous Silica via a Sulfonation Route", J. IND. ENG. CHEM., (2006), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 911 - 917, XP002691533 [X] 1-4 * page 911, column right, line 14 - page 912, column left, line 22; figure 1; table 4 *
by applicantUS2011061689
 US2009260659
 EP2075325
 EP2336282
 US2007105737
 WO2010114698
 WO2009140482
 WO2007068939
 WO2010114700
 WO2009085680
 US2010092765
 WO2011002838
 WO2011084661
 US4152165
 US4338377
 US5936703
 WO2007146680
 WO2009119690