blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2695918 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2695918



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 304
16.04.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 1
05.01.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
11.07.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.07.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.07.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.07.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 48
11.07.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 48
05.04.2017 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
24.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
24.03.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
24.03.2017 Description Search / examination 43
24.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.03.2017 Request for further processing Search / examination 2
17.01.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.12.2016 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
15.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.12.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.10.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
12.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.10.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
09.06.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.04.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
02.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
02.03.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
02.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.03.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.12.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.12.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.08.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
25.08.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.08.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
12.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
12.08.2014 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 4
24.02.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 10
21.02.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
17.02.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.02.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 5
15.01.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
20.02.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.02.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 2
20.02.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
07.08.2012 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.08.2012 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
07.08.2012 Claims Search / examination 5
07.08.2012 Description Search / examination 42
07.08.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.08.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.08.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.08.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.08.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.08.2012 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5