blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2695918


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.04.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
04.01.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
18.08.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.07.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.06.2017 Change - German title published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
30.06.2017 Change - English title published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
30.06.2017 Change - French title published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
06.04.2017 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
28.03.2017 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
28.03.2017 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
27.03.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.01.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
12.10.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.08.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.06.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.03.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.12.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.09.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.08.2015 First examination report
12.08.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.08.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.08.2014 Amendment by applicant
15.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
15.08.2014 Change - designated states published on  17.09.2014  [2014/38]
12.02.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.02.2014  [2014/07]