Auszug aus dem europäischen Patentregister

Rechtsstand: EP2581452

Benannte Vertragsstaaten ATErlöschen: 01.04.2015
 BEErlöschen: 01.04.2015
 BGErlöschen: 01.04.2015
 CHErlöschen: 30.06.2015
CYErlöschen: 01.04.2015
 CZErlöschen: 01.04.2015
 DE 
 DKErlöschen: 01.04.2015
 EEErlöschen: 01.04.2015
 ESErlöschen: 01.04.2015
 FIErlöschen: 01.04.2015
 FR 
 GB 
 GRErlöschen: 02.07.2015
 HUErlöschen: 13.06.2005
 IE 
 ISErlöschen: 01.08.2015
 IT 
 LIErlöschen: 30.06.2015
 LTErlöschen: 01.04.2015
 LUErlöschen: 13.06.2015
 MCErlöschen: 01.04.2015
 NL 
 PLErlöschen: 01.04.2015
 PTErlöschen: 03.08.2015
 ROErlöschen: 01.04.2015
 SEErlöschen: 01.04.2015
 SIErlöschen: 01.04.2015
 SKErlöschen: 01.04.2015
 TRErlöschen: 01.04.2015
Prüfungsverfahren23.02.2015Eingang der Übersetzungen des Patentanspruchs/der Patentansprüche
Entrichtete GebührenJahresgebühr
17.12.2012Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 03
17.12.2012Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 04
17.12.2012Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 05
17.12.2012Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 06
17.12.2012Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 07
17.12.2012Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 08
27.06.2013Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 09
31.03.2014Jahresgebühr entrichtet Patentjahr 10
Europäisches Patent erteilt01.04.2015
Einspruchsverfahren05.01.2016Kein Einspruch fristgerecht eingelegt veröffentlicht am 02.03.2016 
INPADOC-Daten   TooltipDas EPA übernimmt keine Verantwortung für die Richtigkeit von Rechtsstandsdaten, die sich auf die Post-Grant-Phase beziehen, und haftet somit insbesondere nicht für deren Vollständigkeit, Aktualität oder Eignung für einen bestimmten Zweck. Verbindliche Auskünfte erhalten Sie bei den jeweiligen nationalen Patentbehörden.
Datum des Ereignisses:17.04.2013 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Datum des Ereignisses:17.04.2013 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:
Ref Document Number:1759014
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Datum des Ereignisses:13.11.2013 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20131002
 
Datum des Ereignisses:13.11.2013 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Datum des Ereignisses:26.02.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT
Effective DATE:20140122
 
Datum des Ereignisses:17.12.2014 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT
Effective DATE:20141119
 
Datum des Ereignisses:01.04.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Datum des Ereignisses:01.04.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:
Ref Document Number:1759014
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Datum des Ereignisses:01.04.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Datum des Ereignisses:15.04.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Datum des Ereignisses:22.04.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Datum des Ereignisses:13.05.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602005046238 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20150513
 
Datum des Ereignisses:15.05.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 719126 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20150515
 
Datum des Ereignisses:27.05.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Datum des Ereignisses:15.08.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK05 719126 AT T
Code Expl.:-REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:25.09.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MG4D
Code Expl.:-INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.10.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150803
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.10.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.10.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.10.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.10.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.11.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150801
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.11.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150702
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.11.2015 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:05.01.2016 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602005046238 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.01.2016 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.01.2016 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.01.2016 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.01.2016 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.02.2016 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:PL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.02.2016 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.02.2016 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150613
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.02.2016 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:09.03.2016 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20160105
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.04.2016 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150630
 
Datum des Ereignisses:29.04.2016 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150630
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.05.2016 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:28.06.2016 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.08.2016 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.05.2017 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.05.2017 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:HU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO
Effective DATE:20050613
 
Datum des Ereignisses:27.06.2017 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.06.2017 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:30.06.2017 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.08.2017 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:TR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Datum des Ereignisses:26.06.2018 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.07.2018 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20180626
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.07.2018 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20180628
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.08.2018 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20180626
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.10.2018 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180627
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.10.2018 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20180621
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Datum des Ereignisses:31.10.2018 
Beschreibung des Ereignisses:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20180627
Year of Fee Payment:14