blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2581452 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2581452



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 172
05.02.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
03.06.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.04.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
05.03.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.02.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
23.02.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
23.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.11.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
19.11.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.11.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.11.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
25.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.07.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
25.07.2014 Description Search / examination 2
25.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.07.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
03.06.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
20.05.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 7
20.05.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
20.05.2014 Description Search / examination 7
20.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.05.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.01.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
22.01.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.01.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
02.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.10.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
02.10.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
02.10.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
02.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.04.2013 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
03.04.2013 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
20.03.2013 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
14.03.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.03.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 3
14.03.2013 European search report Search / examination 4
08.03.2013 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
07.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.01.2013 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 1
07.01.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.01.2013 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
17.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.12.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
16.11.2012 Deficiencies in sequence listing Search / examination 2
06.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.11.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
06.11.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.11.2012 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
04.09.2012 Invitation to file claims Search / examination 1
17.08.2012 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.08.2012 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
17.08.2012 Description Search / examination 14
17.08.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.08.2012 Drawings Search / examination 4
17.08.2012 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
09.01.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23