blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2581452


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
25.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.09.2017  [2017/39]
12.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.09.2016  [2016/37]
13.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2016  [2016/24]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
12.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
05.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
05.02.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
29.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.03.2016  [2016/09]
15.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
13.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.12.2015  [2015/51]
06.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
04.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
30.05.2015 Change - representative
06.03.2015 (Expected) grant published on  01.04.2015  [2015/14]
26.02.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
26.02.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
26.02.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
19.11.2014 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.07.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.06.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.05.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.04.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.01.2014 First examination report
22.01.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.10.2013 Request for examination filed published on  13.11.2013  [2013/46]
11.10.2013 Change - designated states published on  13.11.2013  [2013/46]
05.10.2013 Amendment by applicant
04.07.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.04.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2013  [2013/16]
21.12.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid