Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2581452

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 01.04.2015
 BELapse: 01.04.2015
 BGLapse: 01.04.2015
 CHLapse: 30.06.2015
CYLapse: 01.04.2015
 CZLapse: 01.04.2015
 DE 
 DKLapse: 01.04.2015
 EELapse: 01.04.2015
 ESLapse: 01.04.2015
 FILapse: 01.04.2015
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 02.07.2015
 HULapse: 13.06.2005
 IE 
 ISLapse: 01.08.2015
 IT 
LILapse: 30.06.2015
 LTLapse: 01.04.2015
 LULapse: 13.06.2015
 MCLapse: 01.04.2015
 NL 
 PLLapse: 01.04.2015
 PTLapse: 03.08.2015
 ROLapse: 01.04.2015
 SELapse: 01.04.2015
 SILapse: 01.04.2015
 SKLapse: 01.04.2015
 TRLapse: 01.04.2015
Examination procedure23.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
17.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
17.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
European patent granted01.04.2015
Opposition procedure05.01.2016No opposition filed within time limit published on 02.03.2016 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:17.04.2013 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:17.04.2013 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:
Ref Document Number:1759014
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:13.11.2013 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20131002
 
Event date:13.11.2013 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:26.02.2014 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT
Effective DATE:20140122
 
Event date:17.12.2014 
Event description:ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT
Effective DATE:20141119
 
Event date:01.04.2015 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:01.04.2015 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:
Ref Document Number:1759014
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:01.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:15.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:22.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:13.05.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602005046238 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20150513
 
Event date:15.05.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 719126 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20150515
 
Event date:27.05.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:15.08.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK05 719126 AT T
Code Expl.:-REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Event date:25.09.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MG4D
Code Expl.:-INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150803
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Event date:30.11.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150801
 
Event date:30.11.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150702
 
Event date:30.11.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Event date:05.01.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602005046238 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Event date:29.01.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Event date:29.01.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Event date:29.01.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Event date:29.01.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:29.02.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:PL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Event date:29.02.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Event date:29.02.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150613
 
Event date:29.02.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Event date:09.03.2016 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20160105
 
Event date:29.04.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150630
 
Event date:29.04.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150630
 
Event date:31.05.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Event date:28.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20160628
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:HU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO
Effective DATE:20050613
 
Event date:27.06.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:30.06.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Event date:30.06.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20170628
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20170627
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20170627
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:TR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20170622
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20170626
Year of Fee Payment:13