Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2581452

EP2581452 - Method for determining biophysical properties [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.02.2016
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG, CY, HU, SE, TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gen-Probe Incorporated
10210 Genetic Center Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2013/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Densham, Daniel
The Old Mill
Beaston Cross
Broadhempston
Devon, TQ9 6BX / GB
 [2013/16]
Representative(s)Lloyd, John Scott
Script IP Limited
Turnpike House
18 Bridge Street
Frome Somerset BA11 1BB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/16]Jappy, John William Graham
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date12180804.213.06.2005
[2013/16]
Priority number, dateGB2004001308211.06.2004         Original published format: GB 0413082
[2013/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2581452
Date:17.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2581452
Date:01.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP14.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, G01N33/543, G01N21/55, B82Y15/00, G02B5/00
[2013/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2013/16]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Bestimmung von biophysischen Eigenschaften[2013/16]
English:Method for determining biophysical properties[2013/16]
French:Procédé pour la définition des propriétés biophysiques[2013/16]
Examination procedure02.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.10.2013Examination requested  [2013/46]
22.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.2015Fee for grant paid
23.02.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.02.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05752343.3  / EP1759014
Opposition(s)05.01.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
17.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
17.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 08
27.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.06.2005
AT01.04.2015
BE01.04.2015
BG01.04.2015
CY01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
SE01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
TR01.04.2015
LU13.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2016/37]AT01.04.2015
BE01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
LU13.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2016/24]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
SI01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
LU13.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2016/22]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
LU13.06.2015
CH30.06.2015
LI30.06.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2016/10]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
PL01.04.2015
RO01.04.2015
SK01.04.2015
LU13.06.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2016/09]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
EE01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
MC01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2016/07]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
DK01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2015/51]AT01.04.2015
CZ01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2015/50]CZ01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
IS01.08.2015
PT03.08.2015
Former [2015/49]CZ01.04.2015
ES01.04.2015
FI01.04.2015
LT01.04.2015
GR02.07.2015
PT03.08.2015
Documents cited:Search[YD]WO9905315  (MEDICAL BIOSYSTEMS LTD [GB], et al) [YD] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO02095070  (MEDICAL BIOSYSTEMS LITD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-13 * claim - *;
 [Y]WO03019245  (UNIV PASTEUR [FR], et al) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP1286187  (COHO HOLDINGS LLC [US]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0007] , [0018] *;
 [Y]EP1008870  (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * claim - *
 [Y]  GUEDON P, "Characterization and optimization of a real-time, parallel, label-free, polypyrrole-based dna sensor by surface plasmon resonance imaging", 20001215, (20001215), vol. 72, no. 24, pages 6003 - 6009, XP055005805 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac000122+
 [Y]  EBBESEN T W ET AL, "Extraordinary optical transmission through sub-wavelength hole arrays", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, (19980212), vol. 391, no. 6668, doi:10.1038/35570, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 667 - 669, XP002133009 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35570
Examination   BROLO A G ET AL, "Surface plasmon sensor based on the enhanced light transmission through arrays of nanoholes in gold films", LANGMUIR, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY; US, vol. 20, no. 12, doi:10.1021/LA0493621, ISSN 0743-7463, (20040608), pages 4813 - 4815, (20040505), XP002617390

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/LA0493621
by applicantWO9905315
 WO0118246
 WO0060114
 EP0589867
    HA ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1999), vol. 96, no. 3, pages 893 - 8,
    J. HISTOCHEM. CYTOCHEM., (1999), vol. 47, page 1179,
    MCHENRY, ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1988), vol. 57, page 519,
    SCHWAGER ET AL., METHODS IN MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1989), vol. 1, no. 4, pages 155 - 159,
    TABOR ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 1612 - 1623,
    LOFAS ET AL., BIOSENS. BIOELECTRON., (1995), vol. 10, pages 813 - 822,
    KONOPSKY, OPT. COM., (2000), vol. 185, pages 83 - 93,
    JONSSON ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1991), vol. 11, pages 620 - 627,