Extrait du Registre européen des brevets

Situation juridique: EP2581452

Etats contractants désignés ATExtinction: 01.04.2015
 BEExtinction: 01.04.2015
 BGExtinction: 01.04.2015
 CHExtinction: 30.06.2015
CYExtinction: 01.04.2015
 CZExtinction: 01.04.2015
 DE 
 DKExtinction: 01.04.2015
 EEExtinction: 01.04.2015
 ESExtinction: 01.04.2015
 FIExtinction: 01.04.2015
 FR 
 GB 
 GRExtinction: 02.07.2015
 HUExtinction: 13.06.2005
 IE 
 ISExtinction: 01.08.2015
 IT 
 LIExtinction: 30.06.2015
 LTExtinction: 01.04.2015
 LUExtinction: 13.06.2015
 MCExtinction: 01.04.2015
 NL 
 PLExtinction: 01.04.2015
 PTExtinction: 03.08.2015
 ROExtinction: 01.04.2015
 SEExtinction: 01.04.2015
 SIExtinction: 01.04.2015
 SKExtinction: 01.04.2015
 TRExtinction: 01.04.2015
Procédure d'examen23.02.2015Réception des traductions de la/des revendication(s)
Taxes payéesTaxe annuelle
17.12.2012Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03
17.12.2012Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04
17.12.2012Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05
17.12.2012Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06
17.12.2012Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 07
17.12.2012Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 08
27.06.2013Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 09
31.03.2014Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 10
Brevet européen délivré01.04.2015
Procédure dopposition05.01.2016Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti publié le 02.03.2016 
Données INPADOC   TooltipLOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents.
Date de lévénement:17.04.2013 
Description de lévénement:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Date de lévénement:17.04.2013 
Description de lévénement:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:
Ref Document Number:1759014
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Date de lévénement:13.11.2013 
Description de lévénement:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20131002
 
Date de lévénement:13.11.2013 
Description de lévénement:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Date de lévénement:26.02.2014 
Description de lévénement:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT
Effective DATE:20140122
 
Date de lévénement:17.12.2014 
Description de lévénement:ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT
Effective DATE:20141119
 
Date de lévénement:01.04.2015 
Description de lévénement:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Date de lévénement:01.04.2015 
Description de lévénement:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:
Ref Document Number:1759014
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Date de lévénement:01.04.2015 
Description de lévénement:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Date de lévénement:15.04.2015 
Description de lévénement:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Date de lévénement:22.04.2015 
Description de lévénement:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Date de lévénement:13.05.2015 
Description de lévénement:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602005046238 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20150513
 
Date de lévénement:15.05.2015 
Description de lévénement:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 719126 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20150515
 
Date de lévénement:27.05.2015 
Description de lévénement:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Date de lévénement:15.08.2015 
Description de lévénement:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK05 719126 AT T
Code Expl.:-REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Date de lévénement:25.09.2015 
Description de lévénement:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MG4D
Code Expl.:-INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT
 
Date de lévénement:30.10.2015 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150803
 
Date de lévénement:30.10.2015 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CZ
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Date de lévénement:30.10.2015 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Date de lévénement:30.10.2015 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Date de lévénement:30.10.2015 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Date de lévénement:30.11.2015 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150801
 
Date de lévénement:30.11.2015 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150702
 
Date de lévénement:30.11.2015 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Date de lévénement:05.01.2016 
Description de lévénement:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R097 602005046238 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION
 
Date de lévénement:29.01.2016 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Date de lévénement:29.01.2016 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Date de lévénement:29.01.2016 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Date de lévénement:29.01.2016 
Description de lévénement:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Date de lévénement:29.02.2016 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:PL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Date de lévénement:29.02.2016 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Date de lévénement:29.02.2016 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150613
 
Date de lévénement:29.02.2016 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Date de lévénement:09.03.2016 
Description de lévénement:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20160105
 
Date de lévénement:29.04.2016 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150630
 
Date de lévénement:29.04.2016 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150630
 
Date de lévénement:31.05.2016 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Date de lévénement:28.06.2016 
Description de lévénement:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:12
 
Date de lévénement:31.08.2016 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Date de lévénement:31.05.2017 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Date de lévénement:31.05.2017 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:HU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO
Effective DATE:20050613
 
Date de lévénement:27.06.2017 
Description de lévénement:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Date de lévénement:30.06.2017 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Date de lévénement:30.06.2017 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Date de lévénement:31.08.2017 
Description de lévénement:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:TR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150401
 
Date de lévénement:26.06.2018 
Description de lévénement:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Date de lévénement:31.07.2018 
Description de lévénement:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20180626
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Date de lévénement:31.07.2018 
Description de lévénement:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20180628
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Date de lévénement:31.08.2018 
Description de lévénement:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20180626
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Date de lévénement:31.10.2018 
Description de lévénement:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180627
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Date de lévénement:31.10.2018 
Description de lévénement:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20180621
Year of Fee Payment:14
 
Date de lévénement:31.10.2018 
Description de lévénement:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20180627
Year of Fee Payment:14