Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2562967

EP2562967 - Information management system for home appliance [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.12.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
30.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2015/03]
Former [2013/09]For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yeouido-dong
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul
150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Yanghwan
LG Electroncis Inc.IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong
Changwon-si
641-711 Gyeongnam / KR
02 / Park, Hyoungjun
LG Electroncis Inc.IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong
Changwon-si
641-711 Gyeongnam / KR
03 / Shim, Jonghoon
LG Electroncis Inc.IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong
Changwon-si
Gyeongnam 641-711 / KR
 [2013/09]
Representative(s)Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Nymphenburger Straße 4
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/03]Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Former [2013/20]Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Former [2013/09]TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR
Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date12181412.322.08.2012
[2013/09]
Priority number, dateKR2011008349322.08.2011         Original published format: KR 20110083493
KR2011008349422.08.2011         Original published format: KR 20110083494
KR2011008349622.08.2011         Original published format: KR 20110083496
KR2011008349722.08.2011         Original published format: KR 20110083497
KR2011008349822.08.2011         Original published format: KR 20110083498
[2013/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2562967
Date:27.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2562967
Date:20.03.2013
[2013/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2562967
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28
[2013/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/09]
TitleGerman:Informationsverwaltungssystem für Haushaltsgeräte[2013/09]
English:Information management system for home appliance[2013/09]
French:Système de gestion d'informations pour appareil domestique[2013/09]
Examination procedure11.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2013Examination requested  [2013/43]
11.08.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.2014Fee for grant paid
08.12.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.12.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.08.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.10.2015   
Dr. Jordan, Volker
Am Vogelherd 2a
82110 Germering / DE
Opponent's representative
Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB, et al
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/47]
Opponent(s)01  12.10.2015   
Dr. Jordan, Volker
Am Vogelherd 2a
82110 Germering / DE
Opponent's representative
Weickmann & Weickmann, et al
Postfach 860 820
81635 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
18.11.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.05.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.10.2017Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.12.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition06.02.2018Appeal received No.  T0375/18
20.04.2018Statement of grounds filed
13.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.08.2012
AL14.01.2015
AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CY14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
MK14.01.2015
MT14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
PT14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
SM14.01.2015
TR14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE22.08.2015
LU22.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU22.08.2012
AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CY14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
MK14.01.2015
MT14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
PT14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
SM14.01.2015
TR14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE22.08.2015
LU22.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2017/38]HU22.08.2012
AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CY14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
MT14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
SM14.01.2015
TR14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE22.08.2015
LU22.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2017/22]AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
MT14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE22.08.2015
LU22.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/33]AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
IE22.08.2015
LU22.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/24]AT14.01.2015
BE14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
LU22.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/22]AT14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
LU22.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
Former [2016/18]AT14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
MC14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
LU22.08.2015
Former [2016/17]AT14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
LU22.08.2015
Former [2016/12]AT14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SI14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2015/49]AT14.01.2015
CZ14.01.2015
DK14.01.2015
EE14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RO14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
SK14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2015/39]AT14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
LV14.01.2015
NL14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
RS14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2015/38]AT14.01.2015
ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
IS14.05.2015
Former [2015/37]ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
PL14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
GR15.04.2015
Former [2015/36]ES14.01.2015
FI14.01.2015
HR14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
SE14.01.2015
BG14.04.2015
NO14.04.2015
Former [2015/35]ES14.01.2015
LT14.01.2015
NO14.04.2015
Former [2015/33]ES14.01.2015
Documents cited:Search[IY]EP2003819  (SONY CORP [JP]) [I] 1-3,8 * paragraphs [0024] - [0103]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0122] - [0131] * * figures 1-4,8 * [Y] 4-7,9-15;
 [A]EP2326114  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] * * paragraphs [0014] - [0018] * * paragraph [0031]; figure 3 *;
 [Y]WO2007004755  (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]; SHIN YOUNG SIK [KR]; JANG HAN-SIK [KR]; PARK Y) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0065] - [0067]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0152] - [0154]; figure 16 *;
 [Y]EP1030521  (ELECTROLUX ABP [SE]) [Y] 5,6 * paragraphs [0022] - [0031]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US7065501  (BROWN MICHAEL WAYNE [US] ET AL) [Y] 5,7 * column 3, line 47 - column 8, line 40; figure 2 *;
 [Y]US2002052913  (YAMADA TERUHIRO [JP] ET AL) [Y] 9-15 * paragraphs [0123] - [0146]; figures 2,3,5 *;
 [Y]US2008280562  (ZEBIC GREGOR [SI] ET AL) [Y] 9-15 * paragraphs [0105] - [0114]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0120] - [0134]; figure 4 *